NEODRON LTD. v. MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Plaintiff: NEODRON LTD.,
Defendant: MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Case Number: 6:2019cv00399
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 24 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending ITC Determination by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Shelton, Barry)
August 23, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by MICROSOFT CORPORATION.(Shelton, Barry)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Applicant David R. Knudson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12442776) by on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Guaragna, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Applicant Robert Williams ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12442590) by on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Guaragna, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Applicant Erik R. Fuehrer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12442473) by on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Guaragna, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Applicant Erin P. Gibson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12442367) by on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Guaragna, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Applicant Sean C. Cunningham ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12442249) by on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Guaragna, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K. Erickson on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION. Attorney Brian K. Erickson added to party MICROSOFT CORPORATION(pty:dft) (Erickson, Brian)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristopher R. Davis on behalf of NEODRON LTD.,. Attorney Kristopher R. Davis added to party NEODRON LTD.,(pty:pla) (Davis, Kristopher)
July 12, 2019 Reset Deadlines: MICROSOFT CORPORATION answer due 8/23/2019. (lad)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The instant Motion is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until and including August 23, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party MICROSOFT CORPORATION(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Service returned by NEODRON LTD.,. MICROSOFT CORPORATION served on 7/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Mirzaie, Reza)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
July 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (lad)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of AO 120 Report Form by NEODRON LTD., (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12295064), filed by NEODRON LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEODRON LTD. v. MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert Williams
Represented By: Erin P. Gibson
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Represented By: Sean C. Cunningham
Represented By: David R. Knudson
Represented By: Erik R. Fuehrer
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEODRON LTD.,
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Kristopher R. Davis
Represented By: Philip X. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?