NEODRON LTD. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al.
Plaintiff: NEODRON LTD.,
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung electronics America, Inc.,, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00400
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 Pro Hac Vice Letter to John C. Kappos. (lad)
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd and Samsung Electronics America Inc.'s Notice of Related Cases by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Pensabene, Marc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 18 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America Inc.'s Opposed Moiton for a Stay Pending Final Disposition of Related Proceedings Before the United States International Trade Commission by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration Marc Pensabene, #2 Exhibit A Declaration of Marc Pensabene, #3 Proposed Order)(Pensabene, Marc)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Darin W. Snyder. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan K Yagura (Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice Of Darin Synder) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12379036) by on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Yagura, Ryan)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicholas J. Whilt. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright (bw)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Marc J. Pensabene. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright (bw)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan K Yagura for Nicholas J. Whilt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12372504) by on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Yagura, Ryan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan K Yagura for Marc J. Pensabene ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12372432) by on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Yagura, Ryan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristopher R. Davis on behalf of NEODRON LTD.,. Attorney Kristopher R. Davis added to party NEODRON LTD.,(pty:pla) (Davis, Kristopher)
July 16, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. answer due 10/10/2019. (lad)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED to October 10, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yagura, Ryan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan K Yagura on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Attorney Ryan K Yagura added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan K Yagura added to party Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(pty:dft) (Yagura, Ryan)
July 12, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #8 Acknowledgment of Service was changed to Summons Returned Executed to reflect accurate answer date of 7/29/19 instead of 8/7/19. (am)
July 11, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NEODRON LTD.,. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (am)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Acknowledgment of Service returned by NEODRON LTD.,. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Mirzaie, Reza)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
July 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (lad)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (lad)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF AO 120 Report Form by NEODRON LTD., (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12295069), filed by NEODRON LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEODRON LTD. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung electronics America, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Marc J. Pensabene
Represented By: Darin W. Snyder
Represented By: Nicholas J. Whilt
Represented By: Ryan K Yagura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Marc J. Pensabene
Represented By: Darin W. Snyder
Represented By: Nicholas J. Whilt
Represented By: Ryan K Yagura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEODRON LTD.,
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Kristopher R. Davis
Represented By: Philip X. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?