Garcia v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Juan M Garcia and Juan M. Garcia, Jr.
Counter Plaintiff: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 6:2019cv00406
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f). The Court shall hold a Rule 16(b) initial pretrial conference on September 18, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske.Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ORIGINAL ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Dennis M. Lynch added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Juan M. Garcia, Jr by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Lynch, Dennis)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (lad)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Juan M. Garcia, Jr. (Taylor, Jessica)
July 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of service via certified mail: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Juan M Garcia. (Taylor, Jessica) Modified on 7/8/2019 (lad).
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12315667), filed by Juan M Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan M Garcia
Represented By: Jessica Spangler Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan M. Garcia, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Spangler Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Dennis M. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?