Duran v. Davis, et al

Plaintiff: David Duran
Defendant: Assist. Warden FNU Akwitti and Director, TDCJ Lorie Davis
Case Number: 6:2019cv00425
Filed: July 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from Eastern District of Texas; Case Number 4:19-cv-00525.
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall correct the docket sheet to note that the lawsuit is construed as a civil rights lawsuit. Further, it is ORDERED that the cause of action is TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Texas, Waco Division. 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and Local General Order 95-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 7/17/2019. (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/18/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Court REFERS the above-styled and numbered civil action to United States Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson to conduct all pretrial proceedings in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/16/2019. (kls, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/18/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Duran. (Attachments: #1 Data sheet, #2 Envelope(s))(daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/18/2019.]
July 16, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***Consent form mailed to petitioner. (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/18/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/18/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 (CONSTRUED) COMPLAINT, filed by David Duran. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(daj, ) Modified on 7/17/2019 (daj, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran v. Davis, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assist. Warden FNU Akwitti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, TDCJ Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?