Farris et al v. Continental Tire the Americas, LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Farris, Aaron Farris, Aleya Farris and Dorothy Farris
Defendant: Continental Tire the Americas, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00436
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f). Initial pretrial conference on Wednesday, October 30, 2019 at 2:15 p.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Continental Tire the Americas, LLC. (Edwards, Scott)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant Continental Tire the Americas, LLC's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Scott G. Edwards added to party Continental Tire the Americas, LLC(pty:dft) by Continental Tire the Americas, LLC.(Edwards, Scott)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Continental Tire the Americas, LLC. (am)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Aaron Farris, Aleya Farris, Christopher Farris, Dorothy Farris. (Harris, David)
July 23, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5)
July 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mc5)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12383536). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Dorothy Farris, Aleya Farris, Aaron Farris, Christopher Farris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harris, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farris et al v. Continental Tire the Americas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Farris
Represented By: David E. Harris
Represented By: Louie J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Farris
Represented By: David E. Harris
Represented By: Louie J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleya Farris
Represented By: David E. Harris
Represented By: Louie J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Farris
Represented By: David E. Harris
Represented By: Louie J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Tire the Americas, LLC
Represented By: Scott G. Edwards
Represented By: Colin L. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?