Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. VMware, Inc.
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC and Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Defendant: VMware, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00449
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Derek T. Gilliland on behalf of Jonathan DeBlois ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12596647) by on behalf of Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilliland, Derek)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Derek T. Gilliland on behalf of Alex Breger ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12596609) by on behalf of Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilliland, Derek)
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Derek T. Gilliland on behalf of Matthew Vella ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12596583) by on behalf of Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilliland, Derek)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Derek T. Gilliland on behalf of Robert Gilman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12596541) by on behalf of Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilliland, Derek)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Gilliland, Derek)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VMware, Inc.. (Vidal, Katherine)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendants Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 10, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 5, 2019 Reset Deadlines: VMware, Inc. answer to amended complaint due 10/10/2019. (lad)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint, by VMware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, M.)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael R. Rueckheim on behalf of Katherine Vidal ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12545379) by on behalf of VMware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rueckheim, Michael)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Brett Johnson for Michael A. Bittner $100 Fee Paid Receipt #0542-12544678 by on behalf of VMware, Inc.. (Johnson, M.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vivek V. Krishnan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12544598) by on behalf of VMware, Inc.. (Krishnan, Vivek)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Brett Johnson on behalf of VMware, Inc.. Attorney M. Brett Johnson added to party VMware, Inc.(pty:dft) (Johnson, M.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael R. Rueckheim on behalf of VMware, Inc. (Rueckheim, Michael)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against All Defendants amending, filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US 7,949,752 B2, #2 Exhibit B - US RE44,686 E, #3 Exhibit C - US RE42,726 E, #4 Exhibit D - US RE43,051 E, #5 Exhibit E - US RE44,818 E)(Gilliland, Derek)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M. Melsheimer on behalf of VMware, Inc.. Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer added to party VMware, Inc.(pty:dft) (Melsheimer, Thomas)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. VMware, Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Gilliland, Derek)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Karl Rupp, Paul J. Hayes, Matthew Vella, Robert R. Gilman, Jonathan DeBlois, Alex Breger. (am)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to VMware, Inc.. (mc5)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (am)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 **ERROR - Electronic Summons Failed to Issue, Will Issue Manually and File as Doc #5 .** Summons Issued as to VMware, Inc.. (mc5) Modified on 7/31/2019 (mc5).
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Gilliland, Derek)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12419468), filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - US 7,949,752 B2, #3 Exhibit B - US RE44,686 E, #4 Exhibit C - US RE42,726 E, #5 Exhibit D - US RE43,051 E, #6 Exhibit E - US RE44,818 E)(Gilliland, Derek)
July 31, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
July 31, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
July 31, 2019 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. VMware, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Represented By: Derek T. Gilliland
Represented By: Robert R. Gilman
Represented By: Jonathan DeBlois
Represented By: Matthew D. Vella
Represented By: Alex E. Breger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Represented By: Derek T. Gilliland
Represented By: Robert R. Gilman
Represented By: Jonathan DeBlois
Represented By: Matthew D. Vella
Represented By: Alex E. Breger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMware, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Melsheimer
Represented By: Katherine Kelly Vidal
Represented By: Vivek V. Krishnan
Represented By: Michael A. Bittner
Represented By: M. Brett Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Rueckheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?