Parus Holdings Inc. v. Amazon.Com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Parus Holdings Inc.
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00454
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Reset Answer Deadlines: Amazon.Com, Inc. answer due 10/14/2019. (bw)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The instant Motion is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jw)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The instant Motion is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until and including October 14, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Shelton, Barry)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (bw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parus Holdings Inc.. Amazon.Com, Inc. served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Fair, Andrea)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea L. Fair on Behalf of Tiffany M. Knapp ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12460123) by on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of Amazon.Com, Inc.. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party Amazon.Com, Inc.(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bw)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Michael N. McNamara, Michael T. Renaud,Kristina R. Cary and Tiffany Knapp for Parus Holdings Inc. (lad)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc. (lad)
August 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L. Fair on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. Attorney Andrea L. Fair added to party Parus Holdings Inc.(pty:pla) (Fair, Andrea)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Ward, T.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Ward, T.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against Amazon.Com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12442918), filed by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 7,076,431, #3 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,451,084)(Ward, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parus Holdings Inc. v. Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parus Holdings Inc.
Represented By: T. John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea L. Fair
Represented By: Tiffany M. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?