Vandiver v. Systems & Services Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Keith Vandiver
Defendant: Systems & Services Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00455
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Keith Vandiver (Agruss, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f). Rule 16(b) initial pretrial conference on Wednesday, October 30, 2019 at 3:45 p.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Systems & Services Technologies, Inc..(Tannery, LynAlise)
September 3, 2019 Answer Deadlines reset: Systems & Services Technologies, Inc. answer due 9/17/2019. (bw)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Defendant Systems & Services Technologies, Inc. is hereby granted a fourteen (14) day extension to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. This extends Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to September 17, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Parties by Systems & Services Technologies, Inc.. (Tannery, LynAlise)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Or Otherwise Respond by Systems & Services Technologies, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Tannery, LynAlise)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith Vandiver. Systems & Services Technologies, Inc. served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Agruss, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Systems & Services Technologies, Inc.. (bw)
August 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Keith Vandiver. (Agruss, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12446273). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Keith Vandiver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Agruss, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vandiver v. Systems & Services Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Vandiver
Represented By: Michael S. Agruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Systems & Services Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: LynAlise K. Tannery
Represented By: Amanda Loughmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?