eCeipt LLC v. Dillard's Inc.
Plaintiff: eCeipt LLC
Defendant: Dillard's Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00469
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Dillard's Inc. answer due 11/11/2019. (lad)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiff's Motion to extend the time for Defendants to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendants shall have up to and including November 11, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by eCeipt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
September 10, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Dillard's Inc. answer due 10/10/2019. (lad)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendants Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 10, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by eCeipt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
August 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dillard's Inc. (lad)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by eCeipt LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by eCeipt LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12478664), filed by eCeipt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: eCeipt LLC v. Dillard's Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: eCeipt LLC
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?