Sayers Construction, LLC v. Timberline Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sayers Construction, LLC
Defendant: Timberline Construction, Inc. and High Voltage, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00487
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 Opposed MOTION to Compel Defendants to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Chain Between Counsel, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email Chain Between Counsel, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Griffith, Casey)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order- Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Consolidate). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Barbee, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by High Voltage, Inc. and Timberline Construction, Inc. (filed pursuant to 10/15/19 Text Order) (lad)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Joint Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The clerk is directed to enter the attached Exhibit 1, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is similarly granted a 41 page limit for its Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
October 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by High Voltage, Inc., Timberline Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Holway, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Sayers Construction, LLC, re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant High Voltage, Inc., Defendant Timberline Construction, Inc. (Griffith, Casey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against High Voltage, Inc., Timberline Construction, Inc. amending, filed by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit B - MSA, #3 Exhibit C - Motion to Vacate)(Griffith, Casey)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Timothy C. Ford as counsel for Defendants. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Edmund Holway for Timothy C. Ford, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12616297) by on behalf of Timberline Construction, Inc. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Holway, Andrew) Modified on 9/17/2019 (lad).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DISPOSITIVEMOTION IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT filed by High Voltage, Inc., Timberline Construction, Inc. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The clerk's office is directed to enter Defendants' Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss, attached as Exhibit 1 to this Motion to Leave. Plaintiff is granted a corresponding 40 pages to respond to Defendants' Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 TIMBERLINE AND HVIS SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS AND/OR TRANSFER VENUE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Timothy C. Ford. (lad)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by High Voltage, Inc., Timberline Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Opposed Motion for Leave to File Dispositive Motion in Excess of Page Limit). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Holway, Andrew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Vacate Final Arbitration Award by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Barbee Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Arbitration Demand, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter Appointing Arbitrator, #4 Exhibit 3 - Arbitrator's Oath, #5 Exhibit 4 - Vento Bio, #6 Exhibit 5 - Ford Bio, #7 Exhibit 6 - Poff Bio, #8 Exhibit 7 - Ford News, #9 Exhibit 8 - HCBA 1, #10 Exhibit 9 - HCBA 2, #11 Exhibit 10 - HCBA 3, #12 Exhibit 11 - HCBA 4, #13 Exhibit 12 - HCBA 5, #14 Exhibit 13 - HCBA Magazine, #15 Exhibit 14 - Hall Bio, #16 Exhibit 15 - Vento Affidavit, #17 Exhibit 16 - WayBack Machine Page, #18 Exhibit 17 - King v. DSE Attorneys, #19 Exhibit 18 - Board Members, #20 Exhibit 19 - Buesing Bio, #21 Exhibit 20 - First Interim Award, #22 Exhibit 21 - AAA Letter, #23 Exhibit 22 - Stipulation of Uncontested Facts, #24 Exhibit 23 - Hearing Transcript Excerpt, #25 Exhibit 24 - Sayers Affidavit Excerpt, #26 Exhibit 25 - Sayers' Proposed Award, #27 Exhibit 26 - Second Interim Award, #28 Exhibit 27 - Legal Fee Claim, #29 Exhibit 28 - Email with Redacted Invoices Excerpt, #30 Exhibit 29 - Sayers Fee Letter, #31 Exhibit 30 - Ford LinkedIn Bio, #32 Exhibit 31 - Ford and Vento Emails, #33 Exhibit 32 - Barbee Email to AAA, #34 Exhibit 33 - AAA Email, #35 Exhibit 34 - Barbee Email to AAA, #36 Exhibit 35 - AAA Email with Supplemental Disclosure, #37 Exhibit 36 - Barbee Email to AAA, #38 Exhibit 37 - Ford Email to AAA, #39 Exhibit 38 - HCBA Luncheon, #40 Exhibit 39 - Email from AAA, #41 Exhibit 40 - Griffith Letter to AAA, #42 Exhibit 41 - Email from AAA, #43 Exhibit 42 - Email from AAA, #44 Exhibit 43 - Final Arbitration Award, #45 Exhibit 44 - Ford LinkedIn, #46 Exhibit 45 - Griffith Email to AAA). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Griffith, Casey)
August 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to High Voltage, Inc. (lad)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Timberline Construction, Inc. (lad)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Griffith, Casey)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Griffith, Casey)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Vacate Arbitration Award ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12516643), filed by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit B - MSA, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffith, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayers Construction, LLC v. Timberline Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timberline Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Peter C. Ruggero
Represented By: Andrew Edmund Holway
Represented By: Timothy C. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Voltage, Inc.
Represented By: Peter C. Ruggero
Represented By: Andrew Edmund Holway
Represented By: Timothy C. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sayers Construction, LLC
Represented By: Casey Lee Griffith
Represented By: Michael Collin Barbee
Represented By: Derek T. Gilliland
Represented By: Maeghan E. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?