Solas OLED Ltd., an Irish corporation, v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Solas OLED Ltd., an Irish corporation,
Counter Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00537
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Readiness (Amended) by Solas OLED Ltd., an Irish corporation, re #14 Notice (Other) (Fair, Andrea)
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by DLA PIPER LLP (US) for Nandan R. Padmanabhan #13 . Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 600025848. (bw)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Readiness by Solas OLED Ltd., an Irish corporation, (Fair, Andrea)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna on behalf of Nandan R. Padmanabhan by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna on behalf of Michael D. Jay ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12802626) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Solas OLED Ltd., an Irish corporation, by Apple Inc..(Guaragna, John)
October 3, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 11/4/2019. (lad)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including November 4, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Solas OLED Ltd., an Irish corporation,. Apple Inc. served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Mirzaie, Reza)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Court's Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
September 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (lad)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Sean A. Luner, Gregory S. Dovel and Jonas B. Jacobson. (lad)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING THE REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK by Solas OLED Ltd., an Irish corporation, (Mirzaie, Reza)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Solas OLED Ltd., an Irish corporation,. (Mirzaie, Reza)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Solas OLED Ltd., an Irish corporation,. (Mirzaie, Reza)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12595375), filed by Solas OLED Ltd., an Irish corporation,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solas OLED Ltd., an Irish corporation, v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Jay
Represented By: Nandan R. Padmanabhan
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solas OLED Ltd., an Irish corporation,
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Represented By: Andrea L. Fair
Represented By: T. John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Neil A. Rubin
Represented By: Kent N. Shum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?