Vantage Micro LLC v. NXP Semiconductors N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Vantage Micro LLC
Defendant: NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP USA, Inc. and NXP B.V.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00584
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Reset Answer Deadlines: NXP B.V. answer due 1/15/2020; NXP Semiconductors N.V. answer due 1/15/2020; NXP USA, Inc. answer due 1/15/2020. (bw)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP B.V., and NXP USA, Inc. shall respond to Plaintiff Vantage Micro LLC's Complaint, (Dkt. 1), on or before January 15, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by NXP B.V., NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
October 30, 2019 Reset Answer Deadlines: NXP B.V. answer due 12/16/2019; NXP Semiconductors N.V. answer due 12/16/2019; NXP USA, Inc. answer due 12/16/2019. (bw)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP B.V. and NXP USA, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Vantage Micro LLC's Complaint, (Dkt. 1), on or before December 16, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by NXP B.V., NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vantage Micro LLC. NXP USA, Inc. served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Chan, Alex)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of NXP B.V.. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party NXP B.V.(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vantage Micro LLC. (Chan, Alex)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP USA, Inc.. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party NXP Semiconductors N.V.(pty:dft), Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party NXP USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman for all proceedings. Judge Alan D Albright no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to NXP USA, Inc.. (bw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bw)
October 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Vantage Micro LLC. to NXP USA, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Co. (Chan, Alex)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Report to USPTO on Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Vantage Micro LLC (Chan, Alex)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Vantage Micro LLC re #1 Complaint, (Chan, Alex)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12703083), filed by Vantage Micro LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Chan, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vantage Micro LLC v. NXP Semiconductors N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NXP Semiconductors N.V.
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NXP USA, Inc.
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NXP B.V.
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vantage Micro LLC
Represented By: Alex Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?