Arruda et al v. Curves International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Healthy Hips, LLC, Gina Haley-Morrell, Cynthia Haley, Paradisco Dream LLC, Elaine Solomon, 2 Josie's LLC, Tonya Grandmaiter, RH Fitness Systems LLC, RKP Enterprises LLC, Linda Preston, Susan Minicozzi, Barbara Tait, Bonita Arruda, Whanger Health & Fitness LLC, Gary Paolillo, Best Health and Fitness, Inc, Yako Kwe Nye Sta Fitness, LLC, Amy Reeves, Linda Lohse, Fit and Firm Forever, LLC, BV Boomers, Inc, MMLC, LLC, Femme Fit All LLC, John Haley, Jenny Schaff Fitness and Music, LLC, Bodyfit, Inc, Heather's Fitness Center, LLC, PWO Fitness LLC, Cami Noble, KV Fitness, LLC, Carolyn Deegan, All Things Enterprises LLC and Maria Montoya
Defendant: Curves NA, Inc, Curves International, Inc. and North Castle Partners, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00092
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 12 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada)
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Whanger Health & Fitness LLC, Healthy Hips, LLC, Cami Noble, 2 Josie's LLC, Amy Reeves, Susan Minicozzi, BV Boomers, Inc, Bonita Arruda, Maria Montoya, Barbara Tait, Linda Lohse, Linda Preston, Bodyfit, Inc, Jenny Schaff Fitness and Music, LLC, All Things Enterprises LLC, Femme Fit All LLC, RKP Enterprises LLC, John Haley, MMLC, LLC, Gina Haley-Morrell, PWO Fitness LLC, Gary Paolillo, RH Fitness Systems LLC, Elaine Solomon, KV Fitness, LLC, Heather's Fitness Center, LLC, Cynthia Haley, Best Health and Fitness, Inc, Yako Kwe Nye Sta Fitness, LLC, Tonya Grandmaiter, Fit and Firm Forever, LLC, Paradisco Dream LLC, Carolyn Deegan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Fortman, Jonathan)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Curves International, Inc., Curves NA, Inc, North Castle Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kirstie M. Simmerman, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Simmerman Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. B to Simmerman Decl., #4 Proposed Order)(Simmerman, Kirstie)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kirstie M. Simmerman for Applicant Peter G. Siachos, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13322617) by on behalf of Curves International, Inc., Curves NA, Inc, North Castle Partners, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Simmerman, Kirstie)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Whanger Health & Fitness LLC, Healthy Hips, LLC, Cami Noble, 2 Josie's LLC, Amy Reeves, Susan Minicozzi, BV Boomers, Inc, Bonita Arruda, Maria Montoya, Barbara Tait, Linda Lohse, Linda Preston, Bodyfit, Inc, Jenny Schaff Fitness and Music, LLC, All Things Enterprises LLC, Femme Fit All LLC, RKP Enterprises LLC, John Haley, MMLC, LLC, Gina Haley-Morrell, PWO Fitness LLC, Gary Paolillo, RH Fitness Systems LLC, Elaine Solomon, KV Fitness, LLC, Heather's Fitness Center, LLC, Cynthia Haley, Best Health and Fitness, Inc, Yako Kwe Nye Sta Fitness, LLC, Tonya Grandmaiter, Fit and Firm Forever, LLC, Paradisco Dream LLC, Carolyn Deegan. Curves NA, Inc served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Fortman, Jonathan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Whanger Health & Fitness LLC, Healthy Hips, LLC, Cami Noble, 2 Josie's LLC, Amy Reeves, Susan Minicozzi, BV Boomers, Inc, Bonita Arruda, Maria Montoya, Barbara Tait, Linda Lohse, Linda Preston, Bodyfit, Inc, Jenny Schaff Fitness and Music, LLC, All Things Enterprises LLC, Femme Fit All LLC, RKP Enterprises LLC, John Haley, MMLC, LLC, Gina Haley-Morrell, PWO Fitness LLC, Gary Paolillo, RH Fitness Systems LLC, Elaine Solomon, KV Fitness, LLC, Heather's Fitness Center, LLC, Cynthia Haley, Best Health and Fitness, Inc, Yako Kwe Nye Sta Fitness, LLC, Tonya Grandmaiter, Fit and Firm Forever, LLC, Paradisco Dream LLC, Carolyn Deegan. North Castle Partners, LLC served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Fortman, Jonathan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Curves NA, Inc. (am)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to North Castle Partners, LLC. (am)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Curves International, Inc.. (am)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by 2 Josie's LLC, All Things Enterprises LLC, Bonita Arruda, BV Boomers, Inc, Best Health and Fitness, Inc, Bodyfit, Inc, Carolyn Deegan, Femme Fit All LLC, Fit and Firm Forever, LLC, Tonya Grandmaiter, Cynthia Haley, John Haley, Gina Haley-Morrell, Healthy Hips, LLC, Heather's Fitness Center, LLC, Jenny Schaff Fitness and Music, LLC, KV Fitness, LLC, Linda Lohse, MMLC, LLC, Susan Minicozzi, Maria Montoya, Cami Noble, PWO Fitness LLC, Gary Paolillo, Paradisco Dream LLC, Linda Preston, RH Fitness Systems LLC, RKP Enterprises LLC, Amy Reeves, Elaine Solomon, Barbara Tait, Whanger Health & Fitness LLC, Yako Kwe Nye Sta Fitness, LLC. (Fortman, Jonathan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13180915), filed by Whanger Health & Fitness LLC, Healthy Hips, LLC, Cami Noble, 2 Josie's LLC, Amy Reeves, Susan Minicozzi, BV Boomers, Inc, Bonita Arruda, Maria Montoya, Barbara Tait, Linda Lohse, Linda Preston, Bodyfit, Inc, Jenny Schaff Fitness and Music, LLC, All Things Enterprises LLC, Femme Fit All LLC, RKP Enterprises LLC, John Haley, MMLC, LLC, Gina Haley-Morrell, PWO Fitness LLC, Gary Paolillo, RH Fitness Systems LLC, Elaine Solomon, KV Fitness, LLC, Heather's Fitness Center, LLC, Cynthia Haley, Best Health and Fitness, Inc, Yako Kwe Nye Sta Fitness, LLC, Tonya Grandmaiter, Fit and Firm Forever, LLC, Paradisco Dream LLC, Carolyn Deegan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Fortman, Jonathan)
February 7, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
February 7, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arruda et al v. Curves International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthy Hips, LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Haley-Morrell
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Haley
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paradisco Dream LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Solomon
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2 Josie's LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Grandmaiter
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RH Fitness Systems LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RKP Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Preston
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Minicozzi
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Tait
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonita Arruda
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whanger Health & Fitness LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Paolillo
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Health and Fitness, Inc
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yako Kwe Nye Sta Fitness, LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Reeves
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lohse
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fit and Firm Forever, LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BV Boomers, Inc
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MMLC, LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Femme Fit All LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Haley
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Schaff Fitness and Music, LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bodyfit, Inc
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather's Fitness Center, LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PWO Fitness LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cami Noble
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KV Fitness, LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Deegan
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Things Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Montoya
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curves NA, Inc
Represented By: Peter G. Siachos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curves International, Inc.
Represented By: Peter G. Siachos
Represented By: Kirstie M. Simmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Castle Partners, LLC
Represented By: Peter G. Siachos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?