Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ty Ty, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Norma Linda De La Cruz and Ty Ty, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00094
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the Docket Control Conference, set for Wednesday, April 8, 2020, is CANCELED AND WILLNOT BE RESET. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
April 6, 2020 Filing 12 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
April 6, 2020 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (King, Jamie)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f), Telephone Conference set for 4/8/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney David G. Tekell added to party Norma Linda De La Cruz(pty:dft), Attorney David G. Tekell added to party Ty Ty, LLC(pty:dft) by Norma Linda De La Cruz, Ty Ty, LLC.(Tekell, David)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Norma Linda De La Cruz served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (King, Jamie)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Ty Ty, LLC served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (King, Jamie)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Norma Linda De La Cruz. (bw)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ty Ty, LLC. (bw)
February 7, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13183063), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ty Ty, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Linda De La Cruz
Represented By: David G. Tekell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Ty, LLC
Represented By: David G. Tekell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?