NavBlazer, LLC v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: NavBlazer, LLC
Defendant: LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. and LG Electronics, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00095
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada)
March 7, 2020 Reset Answer Deadlines: LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. answer due 5/26/2020. LG Electronics, Inc. answer due 5/26/2020. (bw)
March 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Parties' Agreed Motion to extend the time for Defendants to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendants shall have up to and including May 26, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
March 6, 2020 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for both parties by up to 75 days or May 26, 2020 by NavBlazer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fasone, Thomas)
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NavBlazer, LLC. LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. served on 2/17/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Fasone, Thomas)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raymond W Mort, III on behalf of NavBlazer, LLC (Mort, Raymond)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc.. (bw)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics, Inc.. (bw)
February 7, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas G. Fasone, III for Christopher A. Honea ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13183912) by on behalf of NavBlazer, LLC. (Fasone, Thomas)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas G. Fasone, III for Randall T. Garteiser ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13183903) by on behalf of NavBlazer, LLC. (Fasone, Thomas)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas G. Fasone, III for Rene A. Vazquez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13183885) by on behalf of NavBlazer, LLC. (Fasone, Thomas)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NavBlazer, LLC. (Fasone, Thomas)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fasone, Thomas)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NavBlazer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summonses to LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.)(Fasone, Thomas)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by NavBlazer, LLC. (Fasone, Thomas)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13183844), filed by NavBlazer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LG G8 ThinQ marketing material, #2 Exhibit B - LG G8 User Guide)(Fasone, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NavBlazer, LLC v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NavBlazer, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Fasone, III
Represented By: M. Scott Fuller
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?