Intellectual Ventures II LLC v. VMware Inc.
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Defendant: VMware Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00220
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5)
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Austin Division by VMware Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, M.)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5)
April 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Presuit Indirect Infringement Claims Without Prejudice by VMware Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, M.)
April 14, 2020 Reset Answer Deadlines: VMware Inc. answer due 5/26/2020. (bw)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including May 26, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
April 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael R. Rueckheim on behalf of VMware Inc. (Rueckheim, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael R. Rueckheim for Katherine Vidal ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13450578) by on behalf of VMware Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rueckheim, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vivek V. Krishnan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13449559) by on behalf of VMware Inc.. (Krishnan, Vivek)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael A. Bittner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13449491) by on behalf of VMware Inc.. (Bittner, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT by VMware Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, M.)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Brett Johnson on behalf of VMware Inc. (Johnson, M.)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M. Melsheimer on behalf of VMware Inc. (Melsheimer, Thomas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karl Anthony Rupp on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Rupp, Karl)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (am)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Gilliland, Derek)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gilliland, Derek)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file upon opening of the case. Please use Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form event when e-filing. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (bw)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13385147). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Gilliland, Derek)
March 25, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Amended Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19, #2 Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19)(mc5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellectual Ventures II LLC v. VMware Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Gilman
Represented By: Jonathan DeBlois
Represented By: Derek T. Gilliland
Represented By: Karl Anthony Rupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMware Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Rueckheim
Represented By: Katherine Kelly Vidal
Represented By: Michael A. Bittner
Represented By: Vivek V. Krishnan
Represented By: M. Brett Johnson
Represented By: Thomas M. Melsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?