SITO Mobile R&D IP et al v. Hulu, LLC
Defendant: Hulu, LLC
Counter Defendant: SITO Mobile R&D IP and SITO Mobile, Ltd.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00472
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Central California District, California Division as case number 2:21-cv-6322. (jc5)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING #28 Motion to Transfer Case to the Central District of California. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)Case transferred from Texas Western has been opened in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 2:21-cv-06322 (lad).
August 4, 2021 Case transferred to District of Central California. (jc5)
August 2, 2021 Filing 76 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT'S ORDER GRANTING Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Petitioner Hulu, LLC. The April 28, 2021 order is vacated, and the District Court is directed to grant Hulu's motion to the extent that the case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California under 1404(a). (Attachments: #1 Hulu, LLC's Writ of Mandamus, #2 Hulu, LLC's Non Confidential Appendix for Writ of Mandamus)(mc5)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ben M. Davidson for Hulu, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
July 23, 2021 Filing 75 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan N. MacLemore, IV Ben Davidson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15045744) by on behalf of Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MacLemore, Dan)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING #69 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
June 28, 2021 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Hulu, LLC, re #70 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review and Covered Business Method Review filed by Defendant Hulu, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cameron W. Westin, #2 Exhibit A to Westin Declaration)(Snyder, Darin)
June 21, 2021 Filing 72 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd., re #70 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review and Covered Business Method Review filed by Defendant Hulu, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
June 14, 2021 Filing 70 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review and Covered Business Method Review by Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cameron W. Westin, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Darin)
April 30, 2021 Filing 69 Joint MOTION for Protective Order / Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Darin)
April 5, 2021 Filing 68 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on March 22, 2021, Proceedings Transcribed: Videoconference Markman Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 4/26/2021, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2021, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2021, (lr)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Sealed Order denying #29 . Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
March 22, 2021 Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Zoom Markman Hearing held on 3/22/2021. Case called for Markman Hearing by zoom. There were two claim terms that were at issue - the Court heard then and for the first went with the defendant's suggested change. After the claims terms were done parties announced that there is a motion to transfer that is pending and ripe for a ruling. The Court told parties that an order on that motion will be done asap. In the future the Court is working on a plan so that those motions will be ruled on before the Markman Hearing occurs. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik). (bot2)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RESETTING Zoom Markman Hearing for 3/22/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
February 23, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE - Joint Claim Construction Statement by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd. re #61 Response, #53 Response,, #48 Brief, #56 Brief, (Mort, Raymond)
February 18, 2021 Filing 61 RESPONSE (Hulu's Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief) to #56 Brief, by Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy K. Liang, #2 Exhibit 20, #3 Exhibit 21)(Snyder, Darin)
February 15, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Change of Address by Raymond W Mort, III (Mort, Raymond)
February 15, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Change of Address by Raymond W Mort, III (Mort, Raymond)
February 15, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Change of Address by Raymond W Mort, III (Mort, Raymond)
February 15, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Change of Address by Raymond W Mort, III (Mort, Raymond)
February 4, 2021 Filing 56 BRIEF regarding #53 Response,, by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Mort, Raymond)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #55 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Plaintiffs shall have four (4) additional pages for a total of twenty-three (23) pages for its Reply brief. Defendant shall have four (4) additional pages for a total of twenty-three (23) pages for its Sur-Reply brief. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
February 3, 2021 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
February 2, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE Hulu LLC's Notice Regarding Related Cases and Supplemental Authority Re Its Pending Motions to Transfer (Dkts. 28 & 29) and Stay Pending Resolution of its Motion to Transfer (Dkt. 30) by Hulu, LLC (Snyder, Darin)
January 20, 2021 Filing 53 RESPONSE (Hulu's Response to SITO's Opening Claim Construction Brief) to #48 Brief by Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy K. Liang in Support of Hulu's Response to SITO's Opening Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19)(Snyder, Darin)
January 5, 2021 Filing 52 Supplemental Reply in Support of Transfer in Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Declaration of Donald H. Bate Regarding Location of Documents filed by Hulu, LLC, re #29 Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant Hulu, LLC (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF AMY K. LIANG, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(lad)
January 5, 2021 Filing 51 SUPPLEMENT to #40 Sealed/ #43 Response in Opposition to Motion, Document by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd. (lad)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #49 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration of Donald H. Bate Regarding Location of Documents. Noting that the Motion is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #50 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant Hulus Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply in Support of Transfer in Response to Plaintiffs Supplemental Declaration of Donald H. Bate Regarding Location of Documents. Noting that the Motion is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
December 31, 2020 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Reply in Support of Transfer in Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Declaration of Donald H. Bate Regarding Location of Documents by Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Hulu LLC's Supplemental Reply in Support of Transfer in Response to Plaintiffs SITO Mobile R&D IP, LLC and SITO Mobile, Ltd.'s Supplemental Declaration of Donald H. Bate Regarding Location of Documents, #2 Declaration of Amy K. Liang in Support of Hulu LLC's Supplemental Reply in Support of Transfer in Response to Plaintiffs SITO Mobile R&D IP, LLC and SITO Mobile, Ltd.'s Supplemental Declaration of Donald H. Bate Regarding Location of Documents, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Proposed Order Granting Hulu LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Reply in Support of Transfer in Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Declaration of Donald H. Bate Regarding Location of Documents)(Snyder, Darin)
December 24, 2020 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration of Donald H. Bate Regarding Location of Documents by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
December 23, 2020 Filing 48 BRIEF, Correcting #46 Brief by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mort, Raymond) Modified on 12/23/2020 (lad).
December 21, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Hulu, LLC, re #29 Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant Hulu, LLC (REDACTED) (Snyder, Darin)
December 18, 2020 Filing 46 BRIEF by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mort, Raymond)
December 18, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE Hulu LLC's Request for Oral Hearing on its Motion to Transfer to the Central District of California by Hulu, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Darin)
December 14, 2020 Filing 44 Sealed Document filed : HULU LLCS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITSMOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF AMY K. LIANG, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9) (lad)
December 14, 2020 Filing 43 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd., re #28 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of California (REDACTED) filed by Defendant Hulu, LLC (Mort, Raymond)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #42 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk 's Office is directed to file the attached documents under seal. If it has not already done so, Hulu is ordered to file a redacted version of the sealed civil document within 7 days after the filing of the original sealed document. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
December 11, 2020 Filing 42 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer, #3 Declaration of Amy Liang, #4 Ex. 1, #5 Ex. 2, #6 Ex. 3, #7 Ex. 4, #8 Ex. 5, #9 Ex. 6, #10 Ex. 7, #11 Ex. 8, #12 Ex. 9) (Snyder, Darin)
December 9, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Filing of IPRs by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd. (Mort, Raymond)
December 7, 2020 Filing 40 Sealed Document filed: PLAINTIFFS SITO MOBILE R&D IP, LLC AND SITO MOBILE, LTD.S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HULU, LLCS MOTION TO TRANSFER (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Affidavit, #24 Affidavit, #25 Affidavit, #26 Affidavit) (lad)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #39 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk 's Office is directed to file the attached documents under seal. If it has not already done so, Plaintiffs are ordered to file a redacted version of the sealed civil document within 7 days after the filing of the original sealed document.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
December 4, 2020 Filing 39 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Affidavit, #26 Affidavit, #27 Affidavit, #28 Affidavit) (Mort, Raymond)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 4/16/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 5/28/2021. Motions due by 12/10/2021. Markman Hearing set for 3/5/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright. #34 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Schedule Order filed by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
December 3, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darin W. Snyder Filed for Nancy L. Schroder ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14245192) by on behalf of Hulu, LLC. (Snyder, Darin)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #36 Motion for Hearing entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for Consideration is Defendant's Motion for Hearing on its Motion to Stay (ECF No. 30). The Court DENIES the Motion for hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
December 1, 2020 Filing 36 Hulu LLC's Request for Oral Argument on its Motion to Stay Pending Transfer by Hulu, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Darin) Modified on 12/1/2020 (am).
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 3/5/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 4/16/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 5/28/2021. Motions due by 12/10/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
November 17, 2020 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Schedule Order by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
November 16, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Hulu, LLC, re #30 Opposed MOTION to Stay Hulu's Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of its Motion to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California, or, in the Alternative, to Amend the Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Hulu, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cameron Westin)(Snyder, Darin)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Updated Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda)
November 9, 2020 Filing 31 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd., re #30 Opposed MOTION to Stay Hulu's Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of its Motion to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California, or, in the Alternative, to Amend the Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Hulu, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
November 2, 2020 Filing 30 Opposed MOTION to Stay Hulu's Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of its Motion to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California, or, in the Alternative, to Amend the Scheduling Order by Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cameron Westin, #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex. 2, #4 Ex. 3, #5 Ex. 4, #6 Ex. 5, #7 Ex. 6, #8 Ex. 7, #9 Ex. 8, #10 Ex. 9, #11 Ex. 10, #12 Ex. 11, #13 Ex. 12, #14 Ex. 13, #15 Ex. 14, #16 Ex. 15, #17 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Darin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 29 HULUS MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA[HEARING REQUESTED PURSUANT TO CV-7(h)] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Nicholas Brookins) (am)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #27 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk 's Office is directed to file the attached documents under seal.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
October 2, 2020 Filing 28 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of California (REDACTED) by Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Newton in Support of Hulu's Opposed Motion to Transfer to the Central District of California, #2 Declaration of Cameron W. Westin in Support of Hulu's Opposed Motion to Transfer to the Central District of California, #3 Exhibit 1 - US 8,825,887, #4 Exhibit 2 - Tom Candelaria LinkedIn, #5 Exhibit 3 - Gregg Saunders LinkedIn, #6 Exhibit 4 - Sean Clayton LinkedIn, #7 Exhibit 5 - Management Team SITO Mobile, Ltd. (SITO), #8 Exhibit 6 - SITO Employees, #9 Exhibit 7 - SITO Prior Complaint, #10 Exhibit 8 - Brian Kenner LinkedIn, #11 Exhibit 9 - Harry Gruber LinkedIn, #12 Exhibit 10 - US Patent 6,389,467, #13 Exhibit 11 - Hulu C.D. Cal. Cases, #14 Exhibit 12 - Case Statistics, #15 Exhibit 13 - Scarsi Blumenfeld Holcomb Confirmed, #16 Exhibit 14 - Lex Machina, #17 Exhibit 15 - LAX to ACT, #18 Exhibit 16 - Flights SEA to ACT, #19 Exhibit 17 - Flights SEA to LAX, #20 Exhibit 18 - Flights SAN to ACT, #21 Exhibit 19 - Flights SAN to LAX, #22 Exhibit 20 - Distance LA to Waco, #23 Exhibit 21 - Distance SEA to ACT, #24 Exhibit 22 - Distance SEA to LA, #25 Exhibit 23 - Distance SAN to WACO, #26 Exhibit 24 - Distance SAN to LA, #27 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Hulu, LLC's Opposed Motion to Transfer to the Central District of California)(Snyder, Darin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 27 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document (Hulu's Motion to Transfer to the Central District of California), #2 Sealed Document (Declaration of Nicholas Brookins in Support of Hulu's Opposed Motion to Transfer to the Central District of California), #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Hulu, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Motion to Transfer and Brookins Declaration) (Snyder, Darin)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Setting Markman Hearing for 3/5/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2)
September 22, 2020 Filing 25 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Mort, Raymond)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CANCELLING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above entitled and numbered case having been set for TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE on Friday, September 18, 2020 at 03:30 PM is hereby CANCELLED until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, Telephone Conference set for 9/18/2020 03:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RESETTING, Telephone Conference set for 9/18/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
September 3, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd..(Mort, Raymond)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, Telephone Conference set for 9/8/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan N. MacLemore, IV Andrew Bledsoe ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13909249) by on behalf of Hulu, LLC. (MacLemore, Dan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan N. MacLemore, IV Amy K. Liang ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13909230) by on behalf of Hulu, LLC. (MacLemore, Dan)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE, Telephone Conference set for 9/3/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cameron Westin for Hulu, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sm3)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brett J. Williamson for Hulu, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sm3)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Darin W. Snyder for Hulu, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sm3)
August 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan N. MacLemore, IV for Brett Williamson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13861738) by on behalf of Hulu, LLC. (MacLemore, Dan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan N. MacLemore, IV for Cameron Westin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13861736) by on behalf of Hulu, LLC. (MacLemore, Dan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan N. MacLemore, IV for Darin Snyder ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13861735) by on behalf of Hulu, LLC. (MacLemore, Dan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hulu, LLC. (MacLemore, Dan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Dan N. MacLemore, IV added to party Hulu, LLC(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Hulu, LLC.(MacLemore, Dan)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13671336) by on behalf of SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Mort, Raymond)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13671325) by on behalf of SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Mort, Raymond)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13671318) by on behalf of SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Mort, Raymond)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13671295) by on behalf of SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Mort, Raymond)
June 15, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Hulu, LLC answer due 8/13/2020. (am)
June 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiffs' Motion to extend the time for Defendant to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including August 13, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hulu, LLC. (lad)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Mort, Raymond)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Mort, Raymond)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13623900), filed by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond)
June 2, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SITO Mobile R&D IP et al v. Hulu, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hulu, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Lee Czimskey
Represented By: Brett J. Williamson
Represented By: Darin W. Snyder
Represented By: Cameron Westin
Represented By: Andrew Lamb Pattillo
Represented By: Dan N. MacLemore, IV
Represented By: Andrew Bledsoe
Represented By: Amy K. Liang
Represented By: Nancy L. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: SITO Mobile R&D IP
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Represented By: Ronald M. Daignault
Represented By: Stephanie R Mandir
Represented By: Jason S. Charkow
Represented By: Chandran B. Iyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: SITO Mobile, Ltd.
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Represented By: Ronald M. Daignault
Represented By: Stephanie R Mandir
Represented By: Jason S. Charkow
Represented By: Chandran B. Iyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?