Browse3D LLC v. Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Browse3D LLC
Defendant: Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC and Bass Pro, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00649
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Browse3D LLC. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Browse3D LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
August 4, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC answer due 9/16/2020; Bass Pro, LLC answer due 9/16/2020. (lad)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiff's Motion to extend the time for Defendant to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including September 16, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Browse3D LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bass Pro, LLC. (bw)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC. (bw)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Browse3D LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Browse3D LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13771813), filed by Browse3D LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browse3D LLC v. Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bass Pro, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Browse3D LLC
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?