GreatGigz Solutions, LLC v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: GreatGigz Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00652
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Uber Technologies, Inc. answer due 10/1/2020. (am)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Parties' Agreed Motion to extend the time for Defendant to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 1, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until October 1, 2020 by GreatGigz Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fasone, Thomas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shyamkrishna Palaiyanur on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Shyamkrishna Palaiyanur added to party Uber Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Palaiyanur, Shyamkrishna)
August 14, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Uber Technologies, Inc. answer due 9/16/2020. (am)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including September 16, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Villarreal, Jose)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jose Carlos Villarreal on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Jose Carlos Villarreal added to party Uber Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Villarreal, Jose)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randall T. Garteiser on behalf of GreatGigz Solutions, LLC. Attorney Randall T. Garteiser added to party GreatGigz Solutions, LLC(pty:pla) (Garteiser, Randall)
July 20, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Uber Technologies, Inc.. (am)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fasone, Thomas) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/20/2020) (am).
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by GreatGigz Solutions, LLC. (Fasone, Thomas) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/20/2020) (am).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13773747), filed by GreatGigz Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - US6662194, #3 Exhibit B - US7490086, #4 Exhibit C - US9760864, #5 Exhibit D - US10096000)(Fasone, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/20/2020) (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GreatGigz Solutions, LLC v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GreatGigz Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Fasone, III
Represented By: Randall T. Garteiser
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Represented By: M. Scott Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Shyamkrishna Palaiyanur
Represented By: Jose Carlos Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?