eCeipt LLC v. Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC
Plaintiff: eCeipt LLC
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00747
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness in Patent Cases
September 13, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC answer due 10/15/2020. (lad)
September 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiff's Motion to extend the time for Defendant to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 15, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by eCeipt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (lad)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by eCeipt LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by eCeipt LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13870111), filed by eCeipt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: eCeipt LLC v. Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: eCeipt LLC
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?