Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Arista Networks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC and Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Defendant: Arista Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00749
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness in Patent Cases
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLCs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. After consideration, the Court GRANTS the Motion. IT IS ORDERED that the time for Arista Networks, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended to November 5, 2020.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4)
September 21, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Arista Networks, Inc. answer due 11/5/2020. (lad)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilliland, Derek)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Arista Networks, Inc. served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Gilliland, Derek)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arista Networks, Inc.. (am)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Gilliland, Derek)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Paul J. Hayes and Matthew Vella. (lad)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gilliland, Derek)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13871200). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 736 Patent, #3 Exhibit B - 931 Patent, #4 Exhibit C - 153 Patent)(Gilliland, Derek)
August 18, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Arista Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Represented By: Derek T. Gilliland
Represented By: Jonathan DeBlois
Represented By: Robert R. Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Represented By: Derek T. Gilliland
Represented By: Jonathan DeBlois
Represented By: Robert R. Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arista Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?