Estech Systems, Inc. v. Energy Transfer LP
Plaintiff: Estech Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Energy Transfer LP
Case Number: 6:2020cv00773
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Energy Transfer LP. (Zembek, Richard)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Energy Transfer LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zembek, Richard)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness in Patent Cases
September 11, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Energy Transfer LP answer due 10/16/2020. (am)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 16, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Conley Green on behalf of Energy Transfer LP. Attorney Eric Conley Green added to party Energy Transfer LP(pty:dft) (Green, Eric)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard S. Zembek on behalf of Energy Transfer LP. Attorney Richard S. Zembek added to party Energy Transfer LP(pty:dft) (Zembek, Richard)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Energy Transfer LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zembek, Richard)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Todd E. Landis for Estech Systems, Inc.. (am)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Letter to John Wittenzellner for Estech Systems, Inc.. (am)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Energy Transfer LP. (am)
August 25, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Estech Systems, Inc.. (Williams, Fred)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Williams, Fred)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Estech Systems, Inc.. to Energy Transfer LP (Williams, Fred)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13896209), filed by Estech Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estech Systems, Inc. v. Energy Transfer LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Transfer LP
Represented By: Richard S. Zembek
Represented By: Eric Conley Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estech Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Ennis
Represented By: Michael Simons
Represented By: Jonathan L. Hardt
Represented By: Fred I. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?