Bennett v. Hill County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Brian Bennett
Defendant: Zonelle Orozco, Scott Rowe, Hill County Jail, Petty Officer FNU Petty, Sgt. FNU Reese, Billy Olsen, Steve Wrunkel and Hill County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 6:2020cv00811
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order DISMISSING #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Plaintiff has already been granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tb)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Bennett. (am)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Brian Bennett. Show Cause Response due by 11/13/2020. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Statement due on or before October 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of BRIAN BENNETT #2261207, Copy routed to Divisional Financial Deputy. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (#2) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Brian Bennett (#2261207) is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $0. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall collect this amount from the trust fund account or institutional equivalent, when funds are available, and forward it to the clerk of the district court. Thereafter, the plaintiff shall pay $350.00, the balance of the filing fees, in periodic installments. The plaintiff is required to make payments of 20% of the preceding months income credited to the plaintiffs prison account until plaintiff has paid the total filing fees of $350.00.. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter. (lad)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Bennett. (lad)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Brian Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Hill County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zonelle Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petty Officer FNU Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. FNU Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wrunkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?