Double S Services, LLC v. Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,
Plaintiff: Double S Services, LLC
Defendant: Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,
Case Number: 6:2020cv00833
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,, re #12 CORRECTED MOTION to Set Aside Interlocutory Default Judgment and For New Trial, Subject to and Without Waiving its Previously Filed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 12(b) filed by Defendant Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC, (Adams, Kent)
October 19, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Double S Services, LLC, re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Double S Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Interlocutory Default Judgment on Liability)(Brantley, Roy)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Double S Services, LLC, re #12 CORRECTED MOTION to Set Aside Interlocutory Default Judgment and For New Trial, Subject to and Without Waiving its Previously Filed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 12(b) filed by Defendant Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Proposed Order)(Brantley, Roy)
October 12, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,, re #2 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC, (Adams, Kent)
October 12, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,, re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Double S Services, LLC (Adams, Kent)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Double S Services, LLC, re #2 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E1, #2 Exhibit E2, #3 Exhibit E3, #4 Exhibit E4, #5 Exhibit E5, #6 Exhibit E6, #7 Exhibit E7, #8 Exhibit E8, #9 Exhibit E9)(Brantley, Roy)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Double S Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Brantley, Roy)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 CORRECTED MOTION to Set Aside Interlocutory Default Judgment and For New Trial, Subject to and Without Waiving its Previously Filed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 12(b) by Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Adams, Kent)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiff's Motion. Noting that the Court struck Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment and Motion for New Trial (ECF No. 5) that is the subject of Plaintiff's instant Motion, the Court MOOTS the Plaintiff's Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order STRIKING #5 Motion to Set Aside entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Defendant has both failed to request leave of Court to exceed the Court's page limitations and, in fact, exceeded the Court's page limitations as provided by Local Rule CV-7. As such, the Court STRIKES the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 6, 2020 to refile a Motion that complies with the Court's Local Rules. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation in it's Response to Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment and Motion for New Trial by Double S Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limit). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Brantley, Roy)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske.It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's responses to Defendant's Motions (ECF Nos. 2 and 5) are due October 9, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal and Plaintiff's Right to Timely File a Motion to Remand by Double S Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Brantley, Roy)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kent M. Adams for H. Scott Alexander ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13973023) by on behalf of Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Adams, Kent)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT Unsworn Declaration of H. Scott Alexander to #5 MOTION to Set Aside Interlocutory Default Judgment and Motion for New Trial, Subject to and Without Waiving its Previously Filed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 12(b) by Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,. (Adams, Kent)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 ***STRIKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED 10/5/2020*** MOTION to Set Aside Interlocutory Default Judgment and Motion for New Trial, Subject to and Without Waiving its Previously Filed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 12(b) by Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Adams, Kent) Modified on 10/5/2020 (am).
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Subject to and Without Waiving Its Previously Filed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) by Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,.(Adams, Kent)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to H. Scott Alexander for Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC. (am)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Adams, Kent)
September 11, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC, (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13958052), filed by Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Attorney/Party List)(Adams, Kent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Double S Services, LLC v. Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC,
Represented By: Kent M. Adams
Represented By: H. Scott Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Double S Services, LLC
Represented By: Roy D. Brantley
Represented By: Melissa Spinn
Represented By: Charles Alfred Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?