PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., v. CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,
Plaintiff: Proven Networks LLC
Counter Plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00983
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 45 MDL Case electronically transferred in from Eastern District of Texas; Case Number 2:20-cv-00074.
October 19, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to the Western District of Texas Waco Division. (klc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 44 Acknowledgment of Conditional Transfer Order Finalized. Transfer Order Received and Signed by MDL Panel Clerk.(klc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/19/2020. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 17, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR - was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 41, Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 41 FILED IN ERROR Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective Order by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza) Modified on 8/17/2020 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES re #38 Motion REGARDING ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/13/2020. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/13/2020. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 38 Joint MOTION REGARDING ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re Scheduling Conference, by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 36 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #29 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue - CORRECTED filed by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paul A. Kroeger, #2 Exhibit N)(Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #33 Joint MOTION for Entry of Various Case Management Orders filed by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,., Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 11/13/2020., Jury Selection set for 7/12/2021 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Markman Hearing set for 1/29/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in Limine due by 5/17/2021., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2021. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/4/2020. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DISCOVERY ORDER FOR PATENT CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE RODNEY GILSTRAP AND JUDGE ROY PAYNE re #33 Joint MOTION for Entry of Various Case Management Orders filed by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/4/2020. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Entry of Various Case Management Orders by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue - CORRECTED filed by CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Edlin, #2 Ex. 38 - Offices _ Nokia, #3 Ex. 39 - Nokias Software Biz Is Firmly Rooted in Silicon Valley, #4 Ex. 40 - 024 Assignment, #5 Ex. 41 - 454 Assignment, #6 Ahuja Declaration, #7 Davison Declaration, #8 Junjarampalli Declaration)(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/26/2020. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue - CORRECTED filed by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 29 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue - CORRECTED by CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Abe Declaration, #2 Nandy Declaration, #3 Ott Declaration, #4 Index of Exhibits, #5 Ex. 1 - Attorneys Archive - Russ August & Kabat Law, #6 Ex. 2 - RAK Registration, #7 Ex. 3 - RAK Statement of Information, #8 Ex. 4 - Proven Amendment, #9 Ex. 5 - Cisco locations, #10 Ex. 6 - Contact Cisco Website, #11 Ex. 7 - Synamedia Press Release, #12 Ex. 8 - Synamedia About Us, #13 Ex. 9 - Synamedia Press Release 2, #14 Ex. 10 - rfc2890, #15 Ex. 11 - Gopal Dommety, PhD - Stanford University - San Francisco, California LinkedIn, #16 Ex. 12 - US6243667 (NetFlow Patent), #17 Ex. 13 - Darren Kerr - San Francisco Bay Area _ Professional Profile _ LinkedIn, #18 Ex. 14 - Barry Bruins - California Polytechnic S.., #19 Ex. 15 - COPS Quality of Service vs. Any Service at all, #20 Ex. 16 - Randy H Katz, #21 Ex. 17 - Scott Shenker _ EECS at UC Berkeley, #22 Ex. 18 - Ion Stoica_s Home Page, #23 Ex. 19 - Mel Tsai - Distinguished Engineer - Cisco _ LinkedIn, #24 Ex. 20 - US20080077705A1, #25 Ex. 21 - Qing Li - VP of Engineering, Head of Em.., #26 Ex. 22 - Ron Frederick - San Francisco Bay Area _ Professional Profile _ LinkedIn, #27 Ex. 23 - Cem Fide - LinkedIn, #28 Ex. 24 - iCostale - Adaptive Cost Optimization for Storage Clouds (Agarwala), #29 Ex. 25 - Sandip Agarwala - Principal Engineer - Springpath (Acquired by Cisco) _ LinkedIn, #30 Ex. 26 - Divyesh Jadav - San Francisco Bay Area _ Professional Profile _ LinkedIn, #31 Ex. 27 - US20120054447A1, #32 Ex. 28 - Garret Swart - Principal Architect - Oracle _ LinkedIn, #33 Ex. 29 - David Vengerov - Senior Staff ML Engineer - Box _ LinkedIn, #34 Ex. 30 - Krishna Puttaswamy - LinkedIn, #35 Ex. 31 - Intentionally Omitted, #36 Ex. 32 - Andrew Dolganow - LinkedIn, #37 Ex. 33 - Colin Kahn - LinkedIn, #38 Ex. 34 - Murali Kodialam - Bell Labs, #39 Ex. 35 - Thyagarajan Nandagopal - LinkedIn, #40 Ex. 36 - Dan Li - San Francisco Bay Area _ Professional Profile _ LinkedIn, #41 Ex. 37 - Dead-Block Prediction and Dead-Block Correlating Prefetchers (Lai), #42 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Motion to Transfer Venue by CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 7/20/2020. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR)(jml) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 27 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Nandy Declaration, #2 Abe Declaration, #3 Ott Declaration, #4 Index of Exhibits, #5 Ex. 1 - Attorneys Archive - Russ August & Kabat Law, #6 Ex. 2 - RAK Registration, #7 Ex. 3 - RAK Statement of Information, #8 Ex. 4 - Proven Amendment, #9 Ex. 5 - Cisco locations, #10 Ex. 6 - Contact Cisco Website, #11 Ex. 7 - Synamedia Press Release, #12 Ex. 8 - Synamedia About Us, #13 Ex. 9 - Synamedia Press Release 2, #14 Ex. 10 - rfc2890, #15 Ex. 11 - Gopal Dommety, PhD - Stanford University - San Francisco, California LinkedIn, #16 Ex. 12 - US6243667 (NetFlow Patent), #17 Ex. 13 - Darren Kerr - San Francisco Bay Area _ Professional Profile _ LinkedIn, #18 Ex. 14 - Barry Bruins - California Polytechnic S.., #19 Ex. 15 - COPS Quality of Service vs. Any Service at all, #20 Ex. 16 - Randy H Katz, #21 Ex. 17 - Scott Shenker _ EECS at UC Berkeley, #22 Ex. 18 - Ion Stoica_s Home Page, #23 Ex. 19 - Mel Tsai - Distinguished Engineer - Cisco _ LinkedIn, #24 Ex. 20 - US20080077705A1, #25 Ex. 21 - Qing Li - VP of Engineering, Head of Em.., #26 Ex. 22 - Ron Frederick - San Francisco Bay Area _ Professional Profile _ LinkedIn, #27 Ex. 23 - Cem Fide - LinkedIn, #28 Ex. 24 - iCostale - Adaptive Cost Optimization for Storage Clouds (Agarwala), #29 Ex. 25 - Sandip Agarwala - Principal Engineer - Springpath (Acquired by Cisco) _ LinkedIn, #30 Ex. 26 - Divyesh Jadav - San Francisco Bay Area _ Professional Profile _ LinkedIn, #31 Ex. 27 - US20120054447A1, #32 Ex. 28 - Garret Swart - Principal Architect - Oracle _ LinkedIn, #33 Ex. 29 - David Vengerov - Senior Staff ML Engineer - Box _ LinkedIn, #34 Ex. 30 - Krishna Puttaswamy - LinkedIn, #35 Ex. 31 - Worldwide Presence _ Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise, #36 Ex. 32 - Andrew Dolganow - LinkedIn, #37 Ex. 33 - Colin Kahn - LinkedIn, #38 Ex. 34 - Murali Kodialam - Bell Labs, #39 Ex. 35 - Thyagarajan Nandagopal - LinkedIn, #40 Ex. 36 - Dan Li - San Francisco Bay Area _ Professional Profile _ LinkedIn, #41 Ex. 37 - Dead-Block Prediction and Dead-Block Correlating Prefetchers (Lai), #42 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Elise Edlin on behalf of CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7885636. (Edlin, Elise) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Extend the Deadlines to Comply with Infringement, Invalidity, and Subject-Matter Eligibility Contentions. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/7/2020. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Piepmeier on behalf of CISCO SYSTEMS, INC., (Piepmeier, Sarah) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Comply with Infringement, Invalidity, and Subject-Matter Eligibility Contentions by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., (Everingham, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., (Ward, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., (Fair, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., (Henry, Claire) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #14 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/17/2020. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CISCO SYSTEMS, INC., identifying Corporate Parent None for CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,. (Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,. (Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., by CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,.(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Ma on behalf of PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., (Ma, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Anthony Kroeger on behalf of PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., (Kroeger, Paul) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CISCO SYSTEMS, INC., to 6/1/2020. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,.( Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CISCO SYSTEMS, INC., to 5/15/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 13, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 8 and #9, Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) Modified on 4/13/2020 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant's (Corrected) Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,.( Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,.( Jones, Michael) Modified on 4/13/2020 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,.( Jones, Michael) Modified on 4/13/2020 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AGAINST CISCO SYSTEMS, INC, REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK served on Becky Degeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent on March 25, 2020, filed by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,, filed by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
March 9, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against CISCO SYSTEMS, INC., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7698294.), filed by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., v. CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Proven Networks LLC
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Paul A. Kroeger
Represented By: Andrea L. Fair
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: T. John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Ma
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?