Tiff's Treat's Holdings, Inc. v. Ryan Rich d/b/a Hot Box Cookies et al
Plaintiff: Tiff's Treat's Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Cookie Peddlers, LLC doing business as Hot Box Cookies, Hot Box Cookies, LLC and Ryan Rich doing business as Hot Box Cookies
Case Number: 6:2020cv01075
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Tiff's Treat's Holdings, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tiff's Treat's Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Collier, Marc)
December 4, 2020 Cookie Peddlers, LLC answer due 12/23/2020; Hot Box Cookies, LLC answer due 12/23/2020; Ryan Rich answer due 12/23/2020. (bw)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiff's Treat's Holdings, Inc.. All Defendants. Served 12/2/2020. Answer due 12/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Executed Return of Service, #2 Executed Return of Service)(Collier, Marc) Modified on 12/4/2020 (bw).
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ryan Rich. (bw)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hot Box Cookies, LLC. (bw)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cookie Peddlers, LLC. (bw)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Tiff's Treat's Holdings, Inc.. on Ryan Rich, Hot Box Cookies LLC and Cookie Peddlers LLC (Collier, Marc)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Collier, Marc)
November 23, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
November 23, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file upon opening of the case using the e-file event Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (bw)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14211450). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Tiff's Treat's Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Collier, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiff's Treat's Holdings, Inc. v. Ryan Rich d/b/a Hot Box Cookies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cookie Peddlers, LLC doing business as Hot Box Cookies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Box Cookies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Rich doing business as Hot Box Cookies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiff's Treat's Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Marc B. Collier
Represented By: Stephanie A. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?