Studensky v. United HealthCare of Texas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Studensky
Defendant: United HealthCare of Texas, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc. and United Healthcare Community Plan of Texas, L.L.C.
Trustee: United States Trustee- AU12
Case Number: 6:2020mc00930
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 ATTACHMENT to #1 Bankruptcy Reference, Notice of Filing of Defendant's Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Withdraw Reference and in support of Defendant's Motion to Withdraw Reference. (Attachments: #1 United HealthCare's reply brief to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to MtnWRef & in support of MtnWRef, #2 BK Court's Adversary Proc Docket Report) (Hardage, Bridget)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 ATTACHMENT to #1 Bankruptcy Reference, Notice of Filing of Plaintiff's Response In Opposition to Motion to Withdraw Reference. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Response In Oppostion, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (Lawson, Rob)
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 ATTACHMENT to #1 Bankruptcy Reference, (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court's AP Docket Report) (Hardage, Bridget)
October 8, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 Certificate of transmission of Bankruptcy Reference, filed by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc., United HealthCare of Texas, Inc., United Healthcare Community Plan of Texas, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #2 List of Parties, #3 CrtTrnRfcAP)(tr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2020: #4 Amended Party List to include attorney Brad Thompson) (kc). Modified on 10/15/2020 (kc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Studensky v. United HealthCare of Texas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustee- AU12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Eric S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Eric S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Community Plan of Texas, L.L.C.
Represented By: Eric S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Studensky
Represented By: Brian Talbot Cumings
Represented By: Brad Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?