TOT Power Control, S.L. v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: TOT Power Control, S.L.
Defendant: Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc. and Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless
Case Number: 6:2021cv00110
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 14 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1)
April 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TOT Power Control, S.L. (Robinson, Erick)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendants Verizon Communications, Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Patent Infringement. After consideration of said unopposed motion, the Court finds that it should be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants Verizon Communications, Inc. and Cellco partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless have up to and including April 12, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff TOT Power Control, S.L.s Complaint for Patent Infringement. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4)
February 23, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Cellco Partnership answer due 4/12/2021; Verizon Communications, Inc. answer due 4/12/2021. (bw)
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications, Inc.. Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Cellco Partnership(pty:dft), Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Verizon Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Jones, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOT Power Control, S.L.. Cellco Partnership served on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021. (Robinson, Erick)
February 6, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOT Power Control, S.L.. Verizon Communications, Inc. served on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021. (Robinson, Erick)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cellco Partnership. (lad)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Verizon Communications, Inc.. (lad)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Robinson, Erick)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120, FLATTEN, and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (lad)
February 1, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Robinson, Erick)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14437718). No Summons requested at this time, filed by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, Erick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOT Power Control, S.L. v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOT Power Control, S.L.
Represented By: Erick Scott Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless
Represented By: Michael E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?