LED Wafer Solutions LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: LED Wafer Solutions LLC
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00292
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. answer due 7/20/2021. (lad)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including July 20, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LED Wafer Solutions LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. (Liddle, Bradley)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Brian)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LED Wafer Solutions LLC. (Liddle, Bradley)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (lad)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (lad) (lad).
March 26, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad)
March 25, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LED Wafer Solutions LLC. (Carter, E.)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Carter, E.) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/26/2021) (lad).
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14631032), filed by LED Wafer Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carter, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LED Wafer Solutions LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Brian Christopher Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Christopher Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LED Wafer Solutions LLC
Represented By: E. Leon Carter
Represented By: Nathan I. Cox
Represented By: Scott W. Breedlove
Represented By: Erick Scott Robinson
Represented By: Joshua J. Bennett
Represented By: Bradley David Liddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?