Swissdigital USA Co., LTD v. WENGER S.A.
Plaintiff: Swissdigital USA Co., LTD
Defendant: WENGER S.A.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00453
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacqueline P. Altman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14812914) by Dariush Kayhani on behalf of Swissdigital USA Co., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Altman, Jacqueline) Modified on 5/17/2021 (lad).
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dariush Keyhani for Swissdigital USA Co., LTD. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Frances H. Stephenson for Swissdigital USA Co., LTD. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacqueline P. Altman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14767932) by Frances H. Stephenson on behalf of Swissdigital USA Co., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Altman, Jacqueline) Modified on 5/17/2021 (lad).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to WENGER S.A.. (bw)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Altman, Jacqueline)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120, flatten the document and then e-file upon opening of the case using the event Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (bw)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Swissdigital USA Co., LTD. (Altman, Jacqueline)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14758599), filed by Swissdigital USA Co., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Altman, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swissdigital USA Co., LTD v. WENGER S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swissdigital USA Co., LTD
Represented By: Jacqueline P. Altman
Represented By: John P. Palmer
Represented By: Frances H. Stephenson
Represented By: Dariush Keyhani
Represented By: John A. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENGER S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?