VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.
Defendant: Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Services Corp., Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. and Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless
Case Number: 6:2021cv00672
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ad3)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #137 Motion to Continue entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Joint Motion to Continue Trial Setting and Remove from Current Trial Setting. After review and consideration thereof, the Court ORDERS that the Motion is GRANTED. It is, therefore, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the current trial setting of October 16, 2023 be removed from the Courts calendar and all pretrial disclosure deadlines are stayed pending the setting of a new trial date and entry of a scheduling order based thereon. The parties will consult with the Court regarding possible new trial dates available on the Courts calendar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (NMlc)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Stayed (ad3)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE SECOND NOTICE OF ERRATA by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. re #131 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hudnell, Lewis)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Setting and Remove from Current Trial Setting by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Redacted Public Version of #130 Sealed Document,, by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Redacted Copy of Verizon's Opposition to Voip-Pal.com's Motion to Strike Expert Opinions on Non-Infringement and Non-Infringing Alternatives of #121 Sealed Document,, by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Redacted Public Version of #128 Sealed Document,, by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE OF ERRATA by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. re #131 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hudnell, Lewis)
July 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Sealed Document: NOTICE OF SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT of #100 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude The Expert Opinions of John Minor by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp., #131 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4) (Hudnell, Lewis)
July 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC., re #100 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude The Expert Opinions of John Minor by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. filed by Defendant Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant Verizon Services Corp., Defendant Cellco Partnership (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lewis Hudnell, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Affidavit of Tassiulas)(Hudnell, Lewis)
July 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Sealed Document: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO DIRECT INFRINGEMENT DUE TO DIVIDED INFRINGEMENT of #102 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement Due To Divided Infringement by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lewis E. Hudnell, III, #2 Exhibit 1 to Hudnell Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Hudnell Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Hudnell Declaration) (Hudnell, Lewis)
July 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE OF NON CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. re #128 Sealed Document,, #101 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Hudnell, Lewis)
July 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Sealed Document: BRIEF, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS 10 -16 IN OPPOSITION TO of #101 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lewis Hudnell, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16) (Hudnell, Lewis)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC., re #98 Sealed Motion Verizon's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Jacob H. Salk by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. filed by Defendant Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant Verizon Services Corp., Defendant Cellco Partnership (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lewis Hudnell, #2 Exhibit 1)(Hudnell, Lewis)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Sealed Document: NOTICE OF SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS of #125 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #99 Sealed Motion Verizon's Motion to Strike Belated Expert Theories by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14) (Hudnell, Lewis)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC., re #99 Sealed Motion Verizon's Motion to Strike Belated Expert Theories by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. filed by Defendant Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant Verizon Services Corp., Defendant Cellco Partnership (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lewis Hudnell, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit 12)(Hudnell, Lewis)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Sealed Document: NOTICE OF SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS of #97 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp., #123 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 9) (Hudnell, Lewis)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC., re #97 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. filed by Defendant Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant Verizon Services Corp., Defendant Cellco Partnership (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lewis Hudnell, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8)(Hudnell, Lewis)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Non-Confidential Exhibits to Verizons Opposition to VOIP-Pal.Coms Motion to Strike Expert Opinions on Non-Infringement and Non-Infringing Alternatives by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. re #121 Sealed Document,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 8)(Hector, William)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Sealed Document: Verizons Opposition to Voip-Pal.coms Motion to Strike Expert Opinions on Non-infringement and Non-Infringing Alternatives of #103 Opposed Sealed Motion MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A)(2)(B) DISCLOSURES by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 14, #12 Exhibit 15, #13 Exhibit 16, #14 Exhibit 17, #15 Proposed Order) (Hector, William)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Deadlines by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Hudnell, Lewis)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Redacted Public Version of #103 Opposed Sealed Motion MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A)(2)(B) DISCLOSURES by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Redacted Copy of #102 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement Due To Divided Infringement by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Redacted Copy of #101 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Redacted Copy of #100 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude The Expert Opinions of John Minor by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Redacted Copy of #99 Sealed Motion Verizon's Motion to Strike Belated Expert Theories by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Redacted Copy of #98 Sealed Motion Verizon's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Jacob H. Salk by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Redacted Copy of #97 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Conflict with Current Trial Setting by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Dacus, Deron)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ATTACHMENT Corrected Order to #102 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement Due To Divided Infringement by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ATTACHMENT Corrected Order to #101 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ATTACHMENT Corrected Order to #100 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude The Expert Opinions of John Minor by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ATTACHMENT Corrected Order to #99 Sealed Motion Verizon's Motion to Strike Belated Expert Theories by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ATTACHMENT Corrected Order to #98 Sealed Motion Verizon's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Jacob H. Salk by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ATTACHMENT Corrected Order to #97 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #102 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement Due To Divided Infringement by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp., #98 Sealed Motion Verizon's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Jacob H. Salk by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp., #97 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp., #100 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude The Expert Opinions of John Minor by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp., #99 Sealed Motion Verizon's Motion to Strike Belated Expert Theories by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp., #101 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (ad3)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Non Confidential Exhibits by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. re #103 Opposed Sealed Motion MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A)(2)(B) DISCLOSURES by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 to Hudnell Declaration, #2 Exhibit 6 to Hudnell Declaration, #3 Exhibit 7 to Hudnell Declaration)(Hudnell, Lewis)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Opposed Sealed Motion MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A)(2)(B) DISCLOSURES by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lewis E. Hudnell, III, #2 Exhibit 1 to Hudnell Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Hudnell Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 to Hudnell Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 to Hudnell Declaration, #6 Proposed Order) (Hudnell, Lewis)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement Due To Divided Infringement by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Proposed Order) (Hector, William)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Proposed Order) (Hector, William)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude The Expert Opinions of John Minor by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Proposed Order) (Hector, William)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Sealed Motion Verizon's Motion to Strike Belated Expert Theories by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Proposed Order) (Hector, William)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Sealed Motion Verizon's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Jacob H. Salk by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Proposed Order) (Hector, William)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Sealed Motion Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order) (Hector, William)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated Standing Orders: #Order Regarding Court Docket Management and #Amended Standing Order for Pretrial Procedure. Both orders are available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot2)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STATUS REPORT oint Report Regarding Case Narrowing by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING #93 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines: Motions due by 6/2/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 10/16/2023 before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Jury Trial set for 10/16/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ad3)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Joint Motion for Extension of Case Schedule by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hector, William)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #Standing Order Governing Proceedings - Patent Cases available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot2)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Joint Claim Construction Brief or Statement by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 4/28/2023, (lad)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Deadlines by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Hector, William)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Cellco Partnership, re #82 Opposed Sealed Motion Defendants' Opposed Motion to Stay Case Pending IPRs by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. filed by Defendant Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant Verizon Services Corp., Defendant Cellco Partnership (Hector, William)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Redacted Copy of #85 Sealed Document, by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hudnell, Lewis)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. Amended Certificate of Service #85 Sealed Document, (Hudnell, Lewis)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #85 Sealed Document, (lad)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #85 Sealed Document, Declaration of Lewis E. Hudnell III by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Hudnell Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Hudnell Declaration)(Hudnell, Lewis)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Sealed Document: Opposition to Motion to Stay of #82 Opposed Sealed Motion Defendants' Opposed Motion to Stay Case Pending IPRs by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hudnell, Lewis)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Redacted Copy of #82 Opposed Sealed Motion Defendants' Opposed Motion to Stay Case Pending IPRs by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #82 Opposed Sealed Motion Defendants' Opposed Motion to Stay Case Pending IPRs by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (IPR2022-01232 Institution Decision), #2 Exhibit B (IPR2022-01234 Institution Decision), #3 Exhibit C (IPR2022-01235 Institution Decision), #4 Exhibit D (IPR2022-01232 Preliminary Response), #5 Exhibit E (Redacted in Entirety), #6 Exhibit F (Redacted in Entirety))(Hector, William)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Opposed Sealed Motion Defendants' Opposed Motion to Stay Case Pending IPRs by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Ex. E (Gileff Excerpts), #2 Exhibit Sealed Ex. F (Malak Excerpts), #3 Proposed Order) (Hector, William)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #81 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is the Unopposed Motion to Withdraw J. Mark Mann and G. Blake Thompson as Counsel of Record for Defendants Verizon Communications, Inc., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Services, Corp., and Verizon Business Network Services, Inc. and for termination of electronic notices (Motion). Having considered the Motion and noting that it is unopposed, the Court finds that it should be and is hereby GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED that J. Mark Mann and G. Blake Thompson of Mann | Tindel | Thompson are permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate J. Mark Mann and G. Blake Thompson as counsel of record and all electronic notifications to the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (NMlc)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney J. Mark Mann and G. Blake Thompson as Counsel of Record for Defendants by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, G.)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Cellco Partnership(pty:dft), Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Verizon Business Network Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Verizon Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Verizon Services Corp.(pty:dft) (Dacus, Deron)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING #78 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 4/19/2023, Pretrial Conference TBD, Jury Selection set for 7/17/2023 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske, Jury Trial set for 7/17/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright, Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) Modified on 1/13/2023 (lad).
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Agreed Extension Deadline by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Hector, William)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Deadlines by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Hector, William)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING #73 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stanley H. Thompson, Jr. Attorney added for VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lewis E. Hudnell, III by Stanley H. Thompson, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16764458) by on behalf of VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 DISCOVERY DISPUTE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DISCOVERY DISPUTE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Proposed Order Discovery Dispute Order to #67 Order, Set Hearings by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Hector, William)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Proposed Order Discovery Dispute Order to #67 Order, Set Hearings by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Hector, William)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER CANCELLING DISCOVERY HEARING. DISCOVERY HEARING on Thursday, November 03, 2022 at 04:00 PM is herebyCANCELLED. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RESETTING DISCOVERY HEARING by Zoom for 11/3/2022 04:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Setting Zoom Discovery for 11/2/2022 02:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases,2. #Amended Standing Order On Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases. (bot4)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING #63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura A. Wytsma. Attorney added for Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William C. Lawrence. Attorney added for Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William A. Hector Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laura A. Wytsma ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16271579) by on behalf of Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Hector, William)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William A. Hector Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William C. Lawrence ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16271512) by on behalf of Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Hector, William)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF AGREED EXTENSION OF DEADLINE by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Hudnell, Lewis)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DISCOVERY DISPUTE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
June 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 6-3-22, Proceedings Transcribed: Markman hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis (kmdaviscsr@yahoo.com), Telephone number: 254-340-6114. (kd)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Markman Hearing held on 6/3/2022. PARTIES ANNOUNCE READY. STATEMENTS AND ARGUMENTS OF COUNSEL HEAR. WRITTEN ORDER FORTHCOMING. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(zv)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William M. Parrish on behalf of VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. Attorney William M. Parrish added to party VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.(pty:pla) (Parrish, William)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #35 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RESETTING MARKMAN HEARING. Markman Hearing by Zoom reset for 6/3/2022 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RESETTING MARKMAN HEARING. Markman Hearing reset for 5/31/2022 09:00 AM by Zoom before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER, (Markman Hearing set for 5/26/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Joint Claim Construction Brief or Statement by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #49 Claim Construction Brief by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Reply Claim Construction Brief re #46 by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Hector, William) Modified on 4/25/2022 to link to document(zv).
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STATUS REPORT Regarding Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California #35 by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Mann, J.) Modified on 4/25/2022 to link to document (zv).
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The motion is granted because it is unopposed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PTlc)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The motion is granted because it is unopposed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PTlc)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #43 Claim Construction Brief, by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lewis Hudnell, III, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Hudnell, Lewis)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean Franklin Parmenter. Attorney added for VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #44 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lewis E. Hudnell, III of Sean Franklin Parmenter ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15857641). Please resubmit the Certificate Of Service page with a date as an attachment, link to document #44 and flatten. Thank you. (zv)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lewis E. Hudnell, III of Sean Franklin Parmenter ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15857641) by on behalf of VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Opening Claim Construction Brief by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert W. Unikel, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Mann, J.)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp., re #35 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant Verizon Services Corp., Defendant Cellco Partnership (Mann, J.)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Deadline by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Mann, J.)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Deadlines for Claim Construction Briefing by Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Mann, J.)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 5/20/2022 04:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 6/28/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2022. Motions due by 2/21/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright Jury Selection set for 5/16/2023 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF AGREED EXTENSION OF DEADLINE by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Mann, J.)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Sealed Document: Exhibit 3 of #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Hudnell, Lewis)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC., re #35 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant Verizon Services Corp., Defendant Cellco Partnership (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lewis Hudnell, III, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Order)(Hudnell, Lewis)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Proposed Scheduling Order by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF AGREED EXTENSION OF DEADLINE by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Hudnell, Lewis)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF AGREED EXTENSION OF DEADLINE by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Hudnell, Lewis)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Megan S. Woodworth for Verizon Communications, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STATUS REPORT by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Mark Mann for Megan S. Woodworth ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15221890) by on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Frank C. Cimino, Jr for Verizon Communications, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Mark Mann for Frank C. Cimino, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15205155) by on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Mann, J.)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DEFENDANTS' DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp..(Mann, J.)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING #18 Motion for TRO. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff VoIP-Pals Application for Temporary Restriction Order and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants Apple, AT&T, and Verizons request to stay the instant cases are also DENIED. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF DECISION by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hudnell, Lewis)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC., re #18 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lewis E. Hudnell, III, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 22, #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 24, #10 Exhibit 25, #11 Exhibit 26, #12 Exhibit 27, #13 Exhibit 28)(Hudnell, Lewis)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp., re #18 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 2C, #6 Exhibit 2D, #7 Exhibit 2E, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8A, #14 Exhibit 8B, #15 Exhibit 8C, #16 Exhibit 8D, #17 Exhibit 9, #18 Exhibit 10, #19 Exhibit 11, #20 Exhibit 12, #21 Exhibit 13, #22 Exhibit 15, #23 Exhibit 16, #24 Exhibit 17, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 24, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30A, #34 Exhibit 30B, #35 Exhibit 30C, #36 Exhibit 31A, #37 Exhibit 31B, #38 Exhibit 31C, #39 Exhibit 32, #40 Exhibit 33A, #41 Exhibit 33B, #42 Exhibit 34, #43 Exhibit 35, #44 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File or Respond to Consolidated Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion [For] Preliminary Injunction by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William A. Hector for Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., and for Verizon Services Corp. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Reply by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lewis E. Hudnell, III, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin Williams, #19 Proposed Order)(Hudnell, Lewis)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Mark Mann for William A. Hector ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15025778) by on behalf of Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Verizon Services Corp. as to Verizon Services Corp.. Waiver sent on 7/1/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Mann, J.)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Verizon Communications, Inc. as to Verizon Communications, Inc.. Waiver sent on 7/1/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Mann, J.)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Verizon Business Network Services, Inc. as to Verizon Business Network Services, Inc.. Waiver sent on 7/1/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Mann, J.)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cellco Partnership as to Cellco Partnership. Waiver sent on 7/1/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Mann, J.)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by G. Blake Thompson on behalf of Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. Attorney G. Blake Thompson added to party Cellco Partnership(pty:dft), Attorney G. Blake Thompson added to party Verizon Business Network Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney G. Blake Thompson added to party Verizon Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney G. Blake Thompson added to party Verizon Services Corp.(pty:dft) (Thompson, G.)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Mark Mann on behalf of Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. Attorney J. Mark Mann added to party Cellco Partnership(pty:dft), Attorney J. Mark Mann added to party Verizon Business Network Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney J. Mark Mann added to party Verizon Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney J. Mark Mann added to party Verizon Services Corp.(pty:dft) (Mann, J.)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicolas Spiros Gikkas on behalf of VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Gikkas, Nicolas)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Verizon Business Network Services, Inc.. (lad)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Verizon Services Corp.. (lad)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cellco Partnership. (lad)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. to Verizon Services, Verizon Business Network, and Cellco (Hudnell, Lewis)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Verizon Communications, Inc.. (lad)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hudnell, Lewis)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) All 4 summons requested were for the same defendant due to PDF issues, and that one was issued. Plaintiff will need to request summons for additional defendants (lad).
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14956888). No Summons requested at this time, filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - US Patent No. 8,630,234, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - US Patent No. 10,880,721, #4 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Hudnell, Lewis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Services Corp.
Represented By: G. Blake Thompson
Represented By: J. Mark Mann
Represented By: William A. Hector
Represented By: Frank C. Cimino, Jr.
Represented By: Megan S. Woodworth
Represented By: Laura A. Wytsma
Represented By: William C. Lawrence
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Business Network Services, Inc.
Represented By: G. Blake Thompson
Represented By: J. Mark Mann
Represented By: William A. Hector
Represented By: Frank C. Cimino, Jr.
Represented By: Megan S. Woodworth
Represented By: Laura A. Wytsma
Represented By: William C. Lawrence
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: G. Blake Thompson
Represented By: J. Mark Mann
Represented By: William A. Hector
Represented By: Frank C. Cimino, Jr.
Represented By: Megan S. Woodworth
Represented By: Laura A. Wytsma
Represented By: William C. Lawrence
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless
Represented By: G. Blake Thompson
Represented By: J. Mark Mann
Represented By: William A. Hector
Represented By: Frank C. Cimino, Jr.
Represented By: Megan S. Woodworth
Represented By: Laura A. Wytsma
Represented By: William C. Lawrence
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.
Represented By: Lewis E. Hudnell, III
Represented By: Nicolas Spiros Gikkas
Represented By: Sean Franklin Parmenter
Represented By: William M. Parrish
Represented By: Stanley H. Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?