Textron Innovations Inc. v. SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Textron Innovations Inc.
Defendant: SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd., DJI Europe B.V. and DJI Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00740
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D. Siegmund on behalf of Textron Innovations Inc.. Attorney Mark D. Siegmund added to party Textron Innovations Inc.(pty:pla) (Siegmund, Mark)
August 16, 2021 Reset Deadlines: DJI Europe B.V. answer due 10/18/2021; DJI Technology, Inc. answer due 10/18/2021; SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd. answer due 10/18/2021. (ir)
August 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Defendants Waiver of Service by Textron Innovations Inc. re #1 Complaint,, (Meek, Kevin)
August 16, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF AGREED EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Textron Innovations Inc. re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meek, Kevin)
July 29, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Textron Innovations Inc.. SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd. served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Meek, Kevin)
July 29, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Textron Innovations Inc.. DJI Technology, Inc. served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Meek, Kevin)
July 29, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Textron Innovations Inc.. DJI Europe B.V. served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Meek, Kevin)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Harrison Rich for Textron Innovations Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5)
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to DJI Technology, Inc.. (lad)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Textron Innovations Inc.. upon DJI Technology, Inc. (Meek, Kevin)
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd.. (lad)
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to DJI Technology, Inc.. (lad)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to DJI Europe B.V.. (lad)
July 20, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Textron Innovations Inc. v. SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Textron Innovations Inc.
Represented By: Valerie Barker
Represented By: Kevin J. Meek
Represented By: Mark D. Siegmund
Represented By: Harrison Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: John P. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJI Europe B.V.
Represented By: John P. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJI Technology, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?