Weems v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Ruthen James Weems, III
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 6:2021cv00998
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID answer due 12/20/2021. (jc5)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Respondent's response is due on or before December 20, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sf1)
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with Brief in Support by Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harp, Sarah)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Copy routed to Divisional Financial Deputy. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 Filing fee received in the amount of $5, receipt number 600028295 (jc5)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Hearing by Ruthen James Weems, III. (lad)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Miranda Harp on behalf of Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID. Attorney Sarah Miranda Harp added to party Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID(pty:res) (Harp, Sarah)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 ADVISORY TO THE COURT re payment of filing fee by Ruthen James Weems, III. (lad)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO ANSWER PETITION. Service made as directed. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 Habeas Corpus Filing fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number #600028242. (ir)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form)(jc5)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter. (lad)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ruthen James Weems, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weems v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ruthen James Weems, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Represented By: Sarah Miranda Harp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?