Law v. Rosalez
Petitioner: Joshua Daniel Law
Respondent: Warden FNU Rosalez
Case Number: 6:2021cv00999
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Respondent's response is due on or before December 27, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sf1)
November 22, 2021 Reset Deadlines: FNU Rosalez answer due 12/27/2021. (ir)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by FNU Rosalez. (Tully-Doyle, Colton)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 Addendum Brief to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Joshua Daniel Law. (lad)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joshua Daniel Law. Clerk served a copy of the petition, together with anotice of its filing, upon the United States Attorney, by certified mail, return receipt as directed. CMRR #7008 1830 0004 6747. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2021: #1 CM receipt) (lad).
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 Writ of Habeas Corpus Filing fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 600028185. (ir)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter. (lad)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Joshua Daniel Law. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Law v. Rosalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Daniel Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden FNU Rosalez
Represented By: Mary F. Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?