SurfCast, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation
Plaintiff: SurfCast, Inc.
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 6:2021cv01018
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark D. Siegmund (Siegmund, Mark)
October 18, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF AGREED EXTENSION OF DEADLINE by Microsoft Corporation (Smith, Melissa)
October 18, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa)
October 18, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Microsoft Corporation answer due 12/10/2021. (jc5)
October 13, 2021 Filing 14 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SurfCast, Inc.. (Siegmund, Mark)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas G. Southard for SurfCast, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shaun D. Gregory. Attorney added for SurfCast, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mitchell S. Zajac. Attorney added for SurfCast, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian S. Seal. Attorney added for SurfCast, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda)
October 6, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SurfCast, Inc.. Microsoft Corporation served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Siegmund, Mark)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Siegmund for Thomas Southard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15296185) by on behalf of SurfCast, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegmund, Mark) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/5/2021) (jc5). (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/5/2021 due to document submission not flattened) (jc5).
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Siegmund for Shaun Gregory ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15296175) by on behalf of SurfCast, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegmund, Mark)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Siegmund for Mitchell Zajac ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15296166) by on behalf of SurfCast, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegmund, Mark)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Siegmund for Brian S. Seal ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15296158) by on behalf of SurfCast, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegmund, Mark)
October 5, 2021 Document #8 was not flattened. Please notice that all documents are required to be flattened upon filing. The US Clerk's Office will flatten any document needed prior but all parties MUST flatten documents going forward. Contact the Clerk's Office for any questions. (jc5)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Microsoft Corporation. (jc5)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by SurfCast, Inc.. (Siegmund, Mark)
October 4, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad)
October 1, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Siegmund, Mark)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15289845). No Summons requested at this time, filed by SurfCast, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siegmund, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SurfCast, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SurfCast, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Siegmund
Represented By: Brian S. Seal
Represented By: Mitchell S. Zajac
Represented By: Shaun D. Gregory
Represented By: Thomas G. Southard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?