Frost v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Plaintiff: Marc A. Frost, Jr.
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 6:2021cv01248
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marc A. Frost, Jr. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IFP Form)(jc5)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Marc A. Frost, Jr. Show Cause Response due by 2/3/2022. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Marc A. Frost, Jr.(zv) Modified on 1/11/2022 (jc5).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Marc A. Frost, Jr. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Blank IFP Form) (jc5)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter. (lad)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Marc A. Frost, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lad) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/1/2021) (lad).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc A. Frost, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?