Valenzuela v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Plaintiff: Augie Valenzuela
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID, Sgt. Ross and Sgt. Cofield
Case Number: 6:2021cv01258
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID, Sgt. Cofield, Sgt. Ross - Sent by electronic means to Gloria.chandler.oag.texas.gov, leddocket@oag.texas.gov and Elizabeth.mejia@oag.texas.gov. (jc5)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Augie Valenzuela #390994, is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $338.83. After reviewing Plaintiffs pleadings, the Court finds that summary dismissal is not appropriate. It is therefore ORDERED that Bobby Lumpkin, Sgt. Ross, and Sgt. Cofield as defendants, are hereby required to file an answer to such complaint or otherwise plead as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk prepare and issue summons directed to Defendants Bobby Lumpkin, Sgt. Ross, and Sgt. Cofield and forward the same, together with a copy of the amended complaint, and a copy of this Order, by electronic means to gloria.chandler@oag.texas.gov, leddocket@oag.texas.gov, andElizabeth.mejia@oag.texas.gov. Defendants represented by the Attorney Generalsoffice shall have 40 days from the date on which this Order is received to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs claims, except any claims previously dismissed by the Court. Such responsive pleading shall constitute consent in writing to be served by electronic means, as well as waiver of service. If defendant chooses not to accept service through or be represented by the Attorney Generals office (or cannot be located by the Attorney Generals office within the required time period), the Attorney General shall file an Advisory to that effect, and submit the defendants last known address under seal, whereupon the Court shall order alternative service on that defendant.Copy routed to Divisional Financial Deputy. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID, Sgt. Ross, and Sgt. Cofield amending #1 Complaint, filed by Augie Valenzuela.(ir)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Augie Valenzuela. (lad)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Augie Valenzuela. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2021: #1 Exhibit IFP Form) (jc5).
December 3, 2021 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter. (lad)
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Augie Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valenzuela v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augie Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Cofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?