Lambert v. Janczak
Plaintiff: Ryan Lambert
Defendant: Michael Scott Janczak
Case Number: 6:2022cv00269
Filed: March 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Kevin Kepler Bonner added to party Michael Scott Janczak(pty:dft) by Michael Scott Janczak.(Bonner, Kevin)
March 22, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Lambert. Michael Scott Janczak served on 3/22/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. (Strickland, Duncan)
March 14, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jc5)
March 14, 2022 All parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/(jc5)
March 12, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael Scott Janczak. (jc5)
March 12, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ryan Lambert. (Strickland, Duncan)
March 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15810578), filed by Ryan Lambert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit CIP, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Strickland, Duncan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambert v. Janczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Lambert
Represented By: Duncan Harold Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott Janczak
Represented By: Kevin Kepler Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?