Lashify, Inc. v. Qingdao Lashbeauty Cosmetic Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Lashify, Inc.
Defendant: Qingdao Lashbeauty Cosmetic Co., Ltd. d/b/a Worldbeauty and Qingdao Lashbeauty Cosmetic Co., Ltd. doing business as Worldbeauty
Case Number: 6:2022cv00776
Filed: July 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Derek T Gilliland
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Qingdao Lashbeauty Cosmetic Co., Ltd. answer due 9/16/2022. (lad)
August 3, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Complaint by Lashify, Inc.. (McMichael, Jonathan)
July 25, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lashify, Inc.. Qingdao Lashbeauty Cosmetic Co., Ltd. served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022. (Shamilov, Saina)
July 13, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Arthur Menist on behalf of Lashify, Inc. (Menist, Eric)
July 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Thomas McMichael on behalf of Lashify, Inc. (McMichael, Jonathan)
July 13, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan A. Kohm on behalf of Lashify, Inc. (Kohm, Bryan)
July 12, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Qingdao Lashbeauty Cosmetic Co., Ltd. d/b/a Worldbeauty. (sv)
July 12, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sv)
July 12, 2022 All parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/
July 12, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties by Lashify, Inc.. (Shamilov, Saina)
July 12, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Shamilov, Saina)
July 12, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lashify, Inc.. (Shamilov, Saina)
July 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Qingdao Lashbeauty Cosmetic Co., Ltd. d/b/a Worldbeauty ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16247577), filed by Lashify, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shamilov, Saina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lashify, Inc. v. Qingdao Lashbeauty Cosmetic Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashify, Inc.
Represented By: Saina S. Shamilov
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Eric Arthur Menist
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas McMichael
Represented By: Bryan A. Kohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qingdao Lashbeauty Cosmetic Co., Ltd. d/b/a Worldbeauty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qingdao Lashbeauty Cosmetic Co., Ltd. doing business as Worldbeauty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?