Kay v. Killeen Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Jeuudah Kay
Defendant: Killeen Police Department, Bell County Sheriff's Department, CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS, Bell County Texas Govern Office, Smart Communications, John Gauntt, Bell County Detention Center & Medical Department and City of Belton, Texas
Case Number: 6:2022cv01103
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Derek T Gilliland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - 42:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Discovery by Jeuudah Kay (lad)
December 13, 2022 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to Complaint: Further Complaint for Demanded Damages by Jeuudah Kay. (lad)
December 13, 2022 Filing 7 BRIEF "Authorities and Standings: Powers and Authorities by Jeuudah Kay. (lad)
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Barrett, Roy)
November 3, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT SMART COMMUNICATIONS HOLDING, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING BRIEF by Smart Communications. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Doan, Darby)
November 2, 2022 Filing 5 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Jeuudah Kay. (lad)
October 26, 2022 Filing 3 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS, Killeen Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barrett, Roy)
October 25, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad)
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-16675597), filed by CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rivera, Joe)
October 25, 2022 Filing 1 ***Please disregard this document. It will be refiled. It was filed in error.***NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-16675597), filed by CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rivera, Joe) Modified on 10/25/2022 (sm3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kay v. Killeen Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeuudah Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Killeen Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS
Represented By: Roy Lee Barrett
Represented By: Joe Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell County Texas Govern Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart Communications
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gauntt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell County Detention Center & Medical Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Belton, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?