Griffith v. Lumpkin, TDCJ Director
Petitioner: Charles Griffith
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 6:2022cv01143
Filed: October 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Certificate of Appealability is Denied. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Charles Griffith. Show Cause Response due by 12/2/2022. Failure to respond to the Courts order may result in the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute or comply with a court order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DEFICIENCY ORDER. On or before December 2, 2022, submit either the $5.00 filing fee or a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with an in forma pauperis data sheet certified by a law library officer. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form)(bw)
October 31, 2022 Filing 5 Case Transfer Letter. (lad)
October 31, 2022 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from Eastern District of Texas; Case Number 6:22-cv-00412.
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO TRANSFER. It is ORDERED that Griffith's federal habeas petition is construed as being filed under 28 U.S.C. 2254. It is further ORDERED that the petition is TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Texas, Waco Division. The Clerk of Court shall transfer the case to the Western District of Texas, Waco Division, forthwith and without delay. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/31/2022. (wea, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.]
October 31, 2022 Interdistrict transfer to the Western District of Texas, Waco Division. (wea, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.]
October 31, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
October 25, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. MAILED Consent form to Petitioner. (wea, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (wea, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Charles Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope(s))(wea, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffith v. Lumpkin, TDCJ Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?