Industrial Accessories Company et al v. Southwest Electrical Contracting Services, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Industrial Accessories Company and Adelphi Construction, LC
Counter Plaintiff: Southwest Electrical Contracting Services, Ltd.
Case Number: 7:2018cv00123
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Midland Office
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING, Bench Trial set for 11/4/2019 09:00 AM before Judge David Counts. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2019 09:00 AM before Judge David Counts, Jury Selection set for 11/4/2019 09:00 AM before Judge David Counts, Jury Trial set for 11/4/2019 09:00 AM before Judge David Counts, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/14/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2018, Discovery due by 5/10/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 12/14/2018, Motions due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jk)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adelphi Construction, LC, Industrial Accessories Company. (Pennington, Jill)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Counter-Defendants' ANSWER to #5 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Adelphi Construction, LC, Industrial Accessories Company.(Pennington, Jill)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Recommendations - Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan on behalf of ALL PARTIES by Southwest Electrical Contracting Services, Ltd.. (Johnson, R.)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order on behalf of ALL PARTIES by Southwest Electrical Contracting Services, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Johnson, R.)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Original Petition , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Southwest Electrical Contracting Services, Ltd.. (Johnson, R.)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing defendant to file an amended answer within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jk)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Courtwithin thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jk)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Supplement to JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Southwest Electrical Contracting Services, Ltd.. (Johnson, R.) Modified on 7/16/2018 (jk).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jk)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Southwest Electrical Contracting Services, Ltd. (Included as attachment to #1 Notice of Removal). (jk)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southwest Electrical Contracting Services, Ltd. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11006420), filed by Southwest Electrical Contracting Services, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Johnson, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Industrial Accessories Company et al v. Southwest Electrical Contracting Services, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Southwest Electrical Contracting Services, Ltd.
Represented By: R. Wes Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industrial Accessories Company
Represented By: Jill C. Pennington
Represented By: David H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelphi Construction, LC
Represented By: Jill C. Pennington
Represented By: David H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?