Martin et al v. Leasing Partners, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Susan Martin, Tamara Fohr, Freddie Buchanan, Rebecca Eadie, Melanie Cole, Mary Kjellstrom, William Nelson, Johnnie R Long, Jr., Ronald Baird and Johnnie R. Long, Jr.
Defendant: Ben Brewster, Leasing Partners, LLC, Cameron Kulbeth and TXEnergy Leasing, LLC
Case Number: 7:2018cv00174
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Original Complaint by Ben Brewster, Cameron Kulbeth, Leasing Partners, LLC, TXEnergy Leasing, LLC. (Crouch, Amanda)
November 5, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Ben Brewster answer due 11/20/2018; Cameron Kulbeth answer due 11/20/2018; Leasing Partners, LLC answer due 11/20/2018; TXEnergy Leasing, LLC answer due 11/20/2018. (jk)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order It is ORDERED the Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint, Doc. #8 filed November 1, 2018, is GRANTED. The Defendants time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint is extended to November 20, 2018. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Original Complaint by Ben Brewster, Cameron Kulbeth, Leasing Partners, LLC, TXEnergy Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Crouch, Amanda) Modified event type on 11/2/2018 (se).
October 19, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Ben Brewster answer due 11/7/2018; Cameron Kulbeth answer due 11/7/2018; Leasing Partners, LLC answer due 11/7/2018; TXEnergy Leasing, LLC answer due 11/7/2018. (se)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order It is ORDERED the Parties' Joint Stipulation Extending the Time for Defendants to Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint, Doc. #7 filed October 18, 2018, is GRANTED. The time in which the Defendants may move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint is extended to November 7, 2018. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Answer Due Date by Ben Brewster, Cameron Kulbeth, Leasing Partners, LLC, TXEnergy Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Crouch, Amanda) Modified on 10/19/2018 (jk).
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ben Brewster. (lw)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cameron Kulbeth. (lw)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to TXEnergy Leasing, LLC. (lw)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Leasing Partners, LLC. (lw)
September 28, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lw)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ronald Baird, Freddie Buchanan, Melanie Cole, Rebecca Eadie, Tamara Fohr, Mary Kjellstrom, Johnnie R Long, Jr, Susan Martin, William Nelson. (Gameros, Charles)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11283386), filed by Tamara Fohr, Mary Kjellstrom, Johnnie R Long, Jr, Ronald Baird, Melanie Cole, Freddie Buchanan, Rebecca Eadie, Susan Martin, William Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Offer Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Offer Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Royalty Lease - Martin, #4 Exhibit D - Royalty Lease - Cole, #5 Exhibit E - Royalty Lease - Kjellstrom, #6 Exhibit F - Royalty Lease - Eadie, #7 Exhibit G - Royalty Lease - Nelson, #8 Exhibit H - Royalty Lease - Fohr, #9 Exhibit I - Royalty Lease - Long, #10 Exhibit J - Royalty Lease - Buchanan, #11 Exhibit K - Royalty Lease - Baird, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gameros, Charles) (Attachment 12 replaced on 9/28/2018) (lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin et al v. Leasing Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Martin
Represented By: Charles W. Gameros, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Fohr
Represented By: Charles W. Gameros, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Buchanan
Represented By: Charles W. Gameros, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Eadie
Represented By: Charles W. Gameros, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Cole
Represented By: Charles W. Gameros, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kjellstrom
Represented By: Charles W. Gameros, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Nelson
Represented By: Charles W. Gameros, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie R Long, Jr.
Represented By: Charles W. Gameros, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Baird
Represented By: Charles W. Gameros, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie R. Long, Jr.
Represented By: Charles W. Gameros, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Brewster
Represented By: Amanda N. Crouch
Represented By: Zachary Charles Zurek
Represented By: Reagan M. Marble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leasing Partners, LLC
Represented By: Amanda N. Crouch
Represented By: Zachary Charles Zurek
Represented By: Reagan M. Marble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Kulbeth
Represented By: Amanda N. Crouch
Represented By: Zachary Charles Zurek
Represented By: Reagan M. Marble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TXEnergy Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Amanda N. Crouch
Represented By: Zachary Charles Zurek
Represented By: Reagan M. Marble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?