Gutierrez v. Willingham et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Gutierrez
Defendant: Doctor Willingham, Cpl. Padilla, Lt. Nichols, Gary Painter, Cpl. FNU Padilla, Lt. FNU Nichols and Doctor FNU Willingham
Case Number: 7:2018cv00188
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: Ronald C Griffin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 13 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt of order to answer 1983 actions as to Gary Painter. (se)
November 29, 2018 Filing 12 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt of order to answer 1983 actions as to FNU Padilla. (se)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt of order to answer 1983 actions as to FNU Nichols. (se)
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt of order to answer 1983 actions as to FNU Willingham. (se)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 Certified Mail Receipt of #1 Complaint, #6 Response to Order for More Definite Statement, #7 Order for Service and Advisory, #8 Summons Issued. (se)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to FNU Nichols, FNU Padilla, Gary Painter, FNU Willingham. (se)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ADVISORY. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 Order for More Definite Statement by Ricardo Gutierrez. (jk)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Statement due November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of RICARDO GUTIERREZ, #104248. TDCJ - Office of the General Counsel, TDCJ Inmate TrustFund Division received notification by NEF. Midland County Detention Center received notification by mail. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter Sent To Ricardo Gutierrez. (lw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricardo Gutierrez.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (lw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP Filed), filed by Ricardo Gutierrez.(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Willingham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. FNU Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. FNU Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor FNU Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?