Prudential vs Wiseman et al
Plaintiff: Prudential Annuities Life Assurance Corporation
Defendant: Karen Franco, Ind. and as Admin. of the Estate of Bill Weathers, Patricia Butler, Janice W. Bartz, Pamela Wiseman and Karen Franco
Case Number: 7:2019cv00078
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #15 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. ***In the future, when docketing returns of summons, please use the "Summons Returned Executed" docket event as the party being served is not the USA or an agency thereof. (jk)
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prudential Annuities Life Assurance Corporation. Karen Franco served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Matthews, Arlene) Modified on 4/25/2019 (jk).
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prudential Annuities Life Assurance Corporation. Janice W. Bartz served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Matthews, Arlene) Modified on 4/25/2019 to correct answer due date(jk).
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Pamela Wiseman. (se)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Prudential Annuities Life Assurance Corporation. re: Pamela Wiseman (Amnd) (Matthews, Arlene) (Main Document 12 replaced on 4/10/2019 with non-edit form) (se).
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prudential Annuities Life Assurance Corporation. Patricia Butler served on 3/23/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Matthews, Arlene)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Michael J. Hoover added to party Janice W. Bartz(pty:dft) by Janice W. Bartz.(Hoover, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, individually by Karen Franco.(Hoover, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Michael J. Hoover added to party Patricia Butler(pty:dft) by Patricia Butler.(Hoover, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of the Estate of Bill Weathers. Attorney Michael J. Hoover added to party Karen Franco(pty:dft) by Karen Franco.(Hoover, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Karen Franco. (lw)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Pamela Wiseman. (lw)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Janice W. Bartz. (lw)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Patricia Butler. (lw)
March 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lw)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Prudential Annuities Life Assurance Corporation. Patricia Butler; Janice W. Bartz; Pamela Wiseman; Karen A. Franco (Matthews, Arlene)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Interpleader ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11900346). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Prudential Annuities Life Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Filing Per Rule 7.1 of FRCP)(Matthews, Arlene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prudential vs Wiseman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Franco, Ind. and as Admin. of the Estate of Bill Weathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Butler
Represented By: Michael J. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice W. Bartz
Represented By: Michael J. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Franco
Represented By: Michael J. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prudential Annuities Life Assurance Corporation
Represented By: Arlene C. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?