Ruiz-Paredes v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Efrain Ruiz-Paredes
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 7:2019cv00091
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:3114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER IFP OR FEE. Signed by Judge David Counts. (Attachments: #1 Blank Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(se)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter sent to Efrain Ruiz-Paredes. (lw) Modified on 4/9/2019 (lw).
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Return of Seized Property (Filing Fee $400 - Due), filed by Efrain Ruiz-Paredes.(lw) Modified on 4/8/2019 (lw). Modified on 4/9/2019 (lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz-Paredes v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Ruiz-Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?