Wright v. Mike LNU et al

Plaintiff: Glenn Rodney Wright
Defendant: Mike LNU, Shavar Brayson and ProPetro Driver Trainer Program
Case Number: 7:2019cv00119
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: Ronald C Griffin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (dm2)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT, filed by Glenn Rodney Wright.(se) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (se).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Glenn Rodney Wright. (lw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Glenn Rodney Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Proposed Civil Sheet)(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Mike LNU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shavar Brayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProPetro Driver Trainer Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Rodney Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?