Upshaw v. Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC
Plaintiff: Shawnna Upshaw
Defendant: Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00138
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Administratively closing case, without prejudice. Counsel in this case are ordered to file the papers necessary to dismiss this action on or before September 26, 2019. Signed by Judge David Counts. (mg2)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Shawnna Upshaw (Lemberg, Sergei)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (dm2)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC. (Simmerman, Kirstie)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Kirstie M. Simmerman added to party Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC(pty:dft) by Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC.(Simmerman, Kirstie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawnna Upshaw. Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Lemberg, Sergei)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC. (dm2)
June 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dm2)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Shawnna Upshaw. (Lemberg, Sergei)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Shawnna Upshaw. (Lemberg, Sergei)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12229194). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Shawnna Upshaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lemberg, Sergei)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upshaw v. Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnna Upshaw
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC
Represented By: Kirstie M. Simmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?