Resultares, Inc. v. West Texas Safety Training Center et al
Plaintiff: Resultares, Inc.
Defendant: West Texas Safety Training Center and Rackspace US, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00144
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines: West Texas Safety Training Center answer due 9/6/2019. (se)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Richard Davis. (dm2)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Abby L. Parsons. (dm2)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order It is ORDERED the Defendant, West Texas Safety Training Center's (WTSTC), Agreed Motion for Extension of Time, Doc. #12 filed August 6, 2019, is GRANTED as follows: 1) WTSTC will answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Original Complaint on or before September 6, 2019; and 2) WTSTC will respond to the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before September 6, 2019. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(db)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by West Texas Safety Training Center. (Stanfield, Craig)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (dm2)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by West Texas Safety Training Center. (Stanfield, Craig)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by West Texas Safety Training Center. (Stanfield, Craig)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Resultares, Inc.. Signed by Judge David Counts.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Ronald C. Griffin. (dm2)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Resultares, Inc.. (Petroski, Katherine)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Rackspace US, Inc. (dm2)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to West Texas Safety Training Center. (dm2)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Resultares, Inc.. (Petroski, Katherine)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Resultares, Inc. (Petroski, Katherine) Modified on 6/19/2019 to delete incorrect docket event (dm2).
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Resultares, Inc.. (Petroski, Katherine)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (dm2)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Attorney Bobby W. Braxton as to Resultares, Inc. (dm2)
June 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dm2)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Resultares, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D)(Petroski, Katherine)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12246296). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Resultares, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D)(Petroski, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resultares, Inc. v. West Texas Safety Training Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Texas Safety Training Center
Represented By: Craig A. Stanfield
Represented By: Richard D. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rackspace US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resultares, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine L. Petroski
Represented By: Anthony E. Bouselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?