Logan v. PROPETRO HOLDING CORP. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Logan
Defendant: Stephen Herman, Piper Jaffray & Co., PROPETRO HOLDING CORP., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., Spencer D. Armour, III, Ian Denholm, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Dale Redman, Schuyler E. Coppedge, Jeffrey Smith, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Matthew H. Himler, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Johnson Rice & Company L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Peter Labbat and Evercore Group L.L.C.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00217
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 31 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Spencer D. Armour, III, Schuyler E. Coppedge, Stephen Herman, Matthew H. Himler, Peter Labbat, PROPETRO HOLDING CORP.. (Mayer, Theodore)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order It is ORDERED Lesley F. Portnoy's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Doc. #30 filed October 28, 2019, is GRANTED. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. Portnoy has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
October 28, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joe Kendall on Behalf of Lesley F. Portnoy ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12777684) by on behalf of Richard Logan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kendall, Joe)
September 19, 2019 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc.. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to Johnson Rice & Company L.L.C.. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Raymond James & Associates, Inc.. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Piper Jaffray & Co.. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Evercore Group L.L.C.. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Barclays Capital Inc.. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Peter Labbat. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Matthew H. Himler. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Stephen Herman. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Schuyler E. Coppedge. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Spencer D. Armour, III. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Ian Denholm. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Smith. (see)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Dale Redman. (see) Modified date filed on 9/19/2019 (see).
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to PROPETRO HOLDING CORP.. (see) Modified date filed on 9/19/2019 (see).
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Richard Logan. CORRECTED (Kendall, Joe)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. (see)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Letter as to Pavithra Rajesh. (see)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Letter as to Robert V. Prongay. (see)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter as to Lionel Z. Glancy. (see)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter as to Lesley F. Portnoy. (see)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter as to Charles H. Linehan. (see)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 SEE DEFICIENCY NOTICE REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Richard Logan. (Kendall, Joe) Modified on 9/18/2019 (see).
September 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (see)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12613217). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Richard Logan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sworn Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kendall, Joe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan v. PROPETRO HOLDING CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROPETRO HOLDING CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer D. Armour, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Denholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Redman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schuyler E. Coppedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew H. Himler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Rice & Company L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Labbat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evercore Group L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Logan
Represented By: Joe Kendall
Represented By: Lesley F. Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?